Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:22-cv-00574
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024
Case in other court:Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-21-03020
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 2:32 AM CST
Defendant
Tim Greene
Defendant
Lyft Inc
Represented By
Logan T Turner
Buxton Law Group
contact info
Thomas A Paruolo
Dewitt Paruolo & Meek
contact info
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
Represented By
John L Branum
Branum Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey A Curran
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Prescott E Kiplinger
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Jessica S Ladd
Branum PLLC
contact info
Jay M Mitchel
Branum PLLC
contact info
Allyson E Shumaker
Gablegotwals
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 04, 2024
30 30 5 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 03/04 9:11 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Remand. The Court REMANDS this case to the District Court of Oklahoma County, Oklahma, CJ0292103929. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 3/4/2024. (nv)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 29, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 09/29 1:08 PM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John L Branum and Jessica S Ladd terminated. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 9/29/2023. (nv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/27 4:48 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jane Doe. (Ladd, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
27 27 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 09/26 10:12 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jay M Mitchel terminated. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 9/26/2023. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 25, 2023
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 09/25 3:01 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Mitchel, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/25 11:11 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas A Paruolo and Logan T Turner terminated. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 8/25/2023. (nv)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/25 10:29 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lyft Inc. (Paruolo, Thomas)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/25 10:03 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Timila S Rother on behalf of Lyft Inc (Rother, Timila)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/25 9:49 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Melanie W Rughani on behalf of Lyft Inc (Rughani, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
21 21 respm Response to Motion Mon 05/01 11:03 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re20 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Lyft Inc. (Turner, Logan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 04/10 10:35 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Jane Doe. (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
19 19 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/07 1:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Jane Doe. (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Reply Wed 09/07 10:26 AM
ORDER denying17 Motion for Leave to File Reply, because it fails to establish excusable neglect, but sua sponte MODIFIES the deadline for Plaintiff to file her reply to Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Response to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by September 8, 2022. Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 09/07/2022. (nv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
17 17 motion Leave to File Reply Tue 08/30 1:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Leave to File Reply Out of Time by Jane Doe. (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
16 16 respm Reply Mon 08/29 4:42 PM
STRICKEN REPLY by Plaintiff Jane Doe re10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Jane Doe. (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
notice Notice from the Court Mon 08/29 5:09 PM
NOTICE from the Court16 Reply is STRICKEN as untimely. See LCvR7.1(i) "Unless otherwise prohibited by the court, a reply to new matter raised in the response may be filed within 7 days after the date the response was filed." Counsel should file a motion for leave to file out of time. (nv)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
15 15 respm Response to Motion Fri 08/19 11:09 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re10 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support /Defendant Lyft, Inc.'s Response and Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Lyft Inc. (Turner, Logan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
14 14 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 08/08 3:27 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jay M Mitchel on behalf of Jane Doe (Mitchel, Jay)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 08/08 3:26 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jessica S Ladd on behalf of Jane Doe (Ladd, Jessica)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 08/08 3:23 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by John L Branum on behalf of Jane Doe (Branum, John)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 08/08 1:34 PM
Docket Annotation: In light of the Motion to Remand [Doc. No. 10], the Court STRIKES the status and scheduling conference set for 9/1/2022 at 3:00 p.m. and STRIKES the status report deadline of 8/25/2022. (mb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Hearings Mon 08/08 1:34 PM
Status Conference stricken (mb)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
11 11 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/05 4:11 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Prescott E Kiplinger on behalf of Jane Doe (Kiplinger, Prescott)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Remand Fri 08/05 4:08 PM
MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Jane Doe. (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 08/05 4:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jeffrey A Curran on behalf of Jane Doe (Curran, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
8 8 misc Docket Tue 07/26 1:25 PM
CIVIL STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET. Scheduling/Status Conference set for 9/1/2022 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 502 before Judge Jodi W. Dishman. Status Report due by 8/25/2022. (nv)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Mon 07/25 9:16 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Lyft Inc . (Turner, Logan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/20 9:54 AM
ORDER . This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant Lyft, Inc. to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms.". Signed by Judge Jodi W. Dishman on 07/20/2022. (nv)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 07/15 4:10 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE . Case reassigned to Judge Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/15/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 07/15 4:05 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL . Judge Scott L. Palk recused. Signed by Judge Scott L. Palk on 7/15/22. (ms)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 07/12 1:55 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Logan T Turner on behalf of Lyft Inc (Turner, Logan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 07/12 1:53 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas A Paruolo on behalf of Lyft Inc (Paruolo, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
misc Payment for a Civil Case Mon 07/11 9:13 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3945003. (Paruolo, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
1 1 8 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/08 2:31 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2021-3020 filed by Lyft Inc.(rr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1 - 2021-07-27 Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 2021-09-27 State Court Summons Returned,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - 2021-10-14 Def Lyft's Special Appearance and Mtn to Dismiss,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 2021-10-29 Plf's Resp. to Def Lyft's MTD,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - 2021-11-02 Entry of Appearance for JAC and AS,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - 2021-11-24 Def Lyft's Reply in Supp of MTD,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - 2021-12-17 First Amended Petition,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - 2022-01-05 Def Lyft's Answer to P's 1st Amend Pet,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - 2022-07-01 Mot to Withdraw - Shumaker,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - State Court Action Docket Sheet,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet