New York Southern District Court
Judge:Analisa Torres
Case #: 1:22-cv-05842
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Nov 28, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
Michael Strauss
Represented By
Jennifer E. Sherven
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Caitlyn Claire O'Neill
Kaufman Dolowich And Voluck, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc.
Represented By
Jennifer E. Sherven
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Caitlyn Claire O'Neill
Kaufman Dolowich And Voluck, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Laskowski
Represented By
Casey Jo Hail
Stein Adler Dabah Zelkowitz LLP
contact info
Jonathan L. Adler
Stein Adler Dabah Zelkowitz LLP
contact info
Noelle Marie Harvey
Stein Adler Dabah Zelkowitz LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 10, 2023
31 31 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 03/10 2:55 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Thu 03/09 9:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Jennifer Sherven. RE-FILE Document No. 30 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the stipulation of voluntary dismissal was not physically signed by all parties who have appeared. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned ink signature image) PDF. (tp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
30 30 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 03/08 12:47 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Reopen Case Thu 01/26 2:52 PM
ORDER granting28 Letter Motion to Reopen Case. GRANTED. The deadline to reopen this action is extended until February 10, 2023.. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 1/26/2023) (rro) Modified on 1/26/2023 (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
28 28 motion Reopen Case Wed 01/25 6:46 PM
LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case or Extend Deadline to Restore Action addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Casey J. Hail dated 01/25/2023. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
27 27 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Mon 11/28 4:01 PM
ORDER: The Court has been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled. Accordingly, the above-entitled action is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. Any application to reopen must be filed within sixty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same sixty-day period to be so-ordered by the Court. Per Rule IV(C) of the Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 11/28/2022) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Mon 11/28 10:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott: Settlement Conference held on 11/17/2022. (Tam, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
26 26 misc Letter Tue 11/15 5:29 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Casey J. Hail dated 11/15/2022 re: Request to Bring Personal Electronic Devices and General Purpose Computing Devices to Settlement Conference. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Form Order re Personal Electronic Devices and General Purpose Computing Devices
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/15 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noelle Marie Harvey on behalf of Richard Laskowski..(Harvey, Noelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
24 24 misc Letter Fri 11/11 1:03 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jennifer E. Sherven dated November 11, 2022 re: Standing Order M10-468. Document filed by Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Standing Order M10-468
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/18 3:59 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: By Order of Reference dated September 30, 2022 (Dkt. No. 20), Judge Torres referred this case to me for settlement. The parties and the Court conferred, and agreed that the conference will be held before me on November 17, 2022 at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 21D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. As further set forth by this Order. SO ORDERED. Settlement Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 02:15 PM in Courtroom 21D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 10/18/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Conference Tue 10/18 2:50 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Jennifer E. Sherven dated October 18, 2022. Document filed by Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 10/18 3:04 PM
ORDER granting21 Letter Motion for Conference re:21 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott from Jennifer E. Sherven dated October 18, 2022. Application granted. The Court will hold a settlement conference on November 17 at 2:15 p.m. in courtroom 21-D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. Ex parte settlement letters are due by November 10. Additional information about the settlement conference will be provided in an order to be filed shortly on the docket. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott)(Text Only Order) (Cott, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/30 1:06 PM
ORDER By Order of Reference dated September 30, 2022 (Dkt. No. 19), Judge Torres referred this case to me for settlement. The parties are directed to advise the Court within 30 days when they wish to schedule the settlement conference. The parties should do so by filing a letter-motion on the docket that indicates at least three dates that are mutually convenient for the parties. Alternatively, counsel are free to e-mail my deputy clerk, David Tam, at David_Tam@nysd.uscourts.gov to find a mutually convenient date for the parties and the Court. The settlement conference can be conducted either via video conferencing or in-person. When advising the Court as to their preferred scheduling dates, the parties should indicate which format they prefer. If video conference is requested, the Court will provide additional information about the logistics in advance of the conference. An in-person conference will be permitted only if all participants in the conference (attorneys, clients, and any interpreters) comply with the Courts most recent COVID-19 Protocol (available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/covid-19-coronavirus). For avoidance of doubt, all parties must agree to proceeding by video conference or an in-person conference and make a joint application for the method that is preferred. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 9/30/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/30 11:37 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge James L. Cott. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/30/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/13 5:28 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
17 17 order Case Management Plan Wed 09/07 3:53 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a magistrate judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. § 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this Order. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for January 24, 2022 at 11:00 a.m.. Deposition due by 12/16/2022. Fact Discovery due by 1/4/2023. Expert Discovery due by 2/17/2023. Estimate length of trial 3 days. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 9/7/2022) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
16 16 misc Letter Tue 09/06 9:58 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Jonathan Adler dated 09/06/2022 re: Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Adler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order
Thursday, July 21, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/21 4:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan L. Adler on behalf of Richard Laskowski..(Adler, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 07/21 4:37 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(O'Neill, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/21 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlyn Claire O'Neill on behalf of Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(O'Neill, Caitlyn)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/21 4:35 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer E. Sherven on behalf of Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc...(Sherven, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/21 4:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Strauss waiver sent on 7/15/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/21 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc. waiver sent on 7/15/2022, answer due 9/13/2022. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order Wed 07/20 3:04 PM
ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/20/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 07/20 3:02 PM
INITIAL PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to submit a joint letter and a jointly proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by September 6, 2022, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the instructions set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/20/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Wed 07/20 3:00 PM
ORDER: To protect the public health, while promoting the "just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action and proceeding," Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, it is ORDERED pursuant to Rules 30(b)(3) and 30(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure that all depositions in this action may be taken via telephone, videoconference, or other remote means. It is further ORDERED pursuant to Rule 30(b)(5) that a deposition will be deemed to have taken place "before an officer appointed or designated under Rule 28" if such officer attends the deposition using the same remote means used to connect all other participants, so long as all participants (including the officer) can clearly hear and be heard by all other participants. The parties are encouraged to engage in discovery through remote means at every available opportunity. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/20/2022) (ate)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 07/12 2:52 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Strauss. (vf)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/12 2:49 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc.. (vf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/11 11:51 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Strauss, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 07/11 11:49 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 07/11 9:49 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 07/11 9:50 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 07/11 9:51 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/08 4:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/08 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against Michael Strauss, Vanguard Construction & Development Co., Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26388374)Document filed by Richard Laskowski..(Hail, Casey)
Related: [-]