New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Frederic Block
Referred: Marcia M Henry
Case #: 1:22-cv-04057
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:Jun 12, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 07, 2023 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School
Represented By
Richard B. Epstein
Miranda Slone Sklarin Verveniotis LLP
contact info
Michael Anthony Miranda
Miranda Slone Sklarin Verveniotis, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Roza Tachalov
Represented By
Brittany Alexandra Stevens
Phillips & Associates, PLLC
contact info
Morgan L Mickelsen
Phillips & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, June 12, 2023
24 24 1 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/12 4:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 06/12 4:18 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry24 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 6/12/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
23 23 1 pgs misc Status Report Fri 05/12 11:42 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Settlement Status Report by Roza Tachalov (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
order Status Report Order Fri 05/12 11:48 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application23 with the consent of the defendant is GRANTED. By June 12, 2023 counsel shall either file their stipulation of settlement or a status report letter as to their settlement.Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/12/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
22 22 misc Letter Mon 04/10 5:11 PM
Letter regarding settlement by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Mon 04/10 5:25 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant reports22 that this case has settled. The date for the defendant's to file their fully briefed motion to dismiss is stayed. By May 12, 2023 counsel shall either file their stipulation of settlement or a status report letter as to their settlement. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/10/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 03/29 10:46 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application21 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon revised briefing schedule. By May 30, 2023 defendant's shall file their fully briefed motion to dismiss. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 3/29/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 03/28 6:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Advising Court of revised briefing schedule for motion to dismiss by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School. (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
adr Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled) Wed 03/01 9:31 AM
REPORT of Mediation Unsettled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report due by 3/15/2023. (DS)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Case Returned from Mediation Wed 03/01 10:08 AM
Case returned from mediation. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
20 20 misc Letter Wed 02/15 9:21 AM
Letter informing Court of briefing schedule for motion to dismiss by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School (Miranda, Michael)
Related: [-]
order Scheduling Order Wed 02/15 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's letter application20 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The Court adopts the parties agreed upon briefing schedule. By May 16, 2023 defendant's shall file their fully briefed motion to dismiss. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall follow J. Block's motion rules, specifically section 2(D) when filing their motions. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/15/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
19 19 adr Selection of Mediator Fri 02/10 4:39 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Joseph Kevin McKay selected as Mediator. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation. For more details on the submission, please consult Local Civil Rule 83.8(b)(4). Attendance is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation (in-person or remote) must be signed at or before the initial mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned via e-mail to nyed_adr@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Mediators contact information can be found on the docket sheet. Within fourteen days of the conclusion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report. Date Time and Location:February 28, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Location tbd (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
18 18 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/08 4:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Second Amended Complaint served on Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School on February 7, 2023, filed by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/07 5:06 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School, filed by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letter to NYCCHR
Thursday, February 02, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 02/02 11:44 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant's letter application16 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. The time to select a mediator is extended until February 10, 2023. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 2/2/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 02/01 5:10 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File selection of mediator by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School. (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
minutes Pre Motion Conference Wed 01/18 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederic Block: Brittany Stevens, Esq. for the plaintiff and Richard Epstein, Esq. for the defendants, all present. Pre-motion conference held on 1/18/2023. Defendants anticipated motion to dismiss was discussed. The case is referred to mediation. By February 7, 2023 plaintiff will serve and file a second amended complaint. If defendants still wish to move to dismiss the second amended complaint, then by February 14, 2023 counsel shall file a letter with their agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel may modify their agreed upon briefing schedule without court approval. Counsel shall file a letter notifying the Court of their modified agreed upon briefing schedule. Counsel shall serve and file their fully briefed motion according to J. Blocks motion rules. The Court does not require a courtesy copy of the motion papers. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (MI)
Related: [-]
order Order Referring Case to Mediation Wed 01/18 3:13 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 3/17/23.Selection of Mediator due by 2/1/2023. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 1/18/2023. (MI)
Related: [-]
adr Mediation Instructions Wed 01/18 3:41 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms, and must be signed by all participants, including the mediator. The signed confidentiality stipulation must be uploaded via the Courts website here: https://edny.app.box.com/f/1fabaa0a170b4fd293704738238fd876. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be submitted within two weeks following mediation session. (TP)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
15 15 motion Adjourn Conference Mon 11/28 2:01 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Mon 11/28 3:00 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Plaintiff's letter application15 with the consent of the defendant is GRANTED. The in person pre-motion conference scheduled for January 10, 2022 is adjourned to January 18, 2022 at 2:30 P.M. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/28/2022. (MI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/28 3:01 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/18/2023 02:30 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
order Scheduling Order Thu 11/17 12:30 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The in person pre-motion conference scheduled for December 5, 2022 is being adjourned by the Court to January 10, 2023 @ 4:00 PM, due to a conflict with the Court's calendar. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 11/17/2022. (MI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 11/17 12:31 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 1/10/2023 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
order Scheduling Order Mon 10/31 12:14 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The in person pre-motion conference scheduled for November 7, 2022 is being adjourned by the Court to December 5, 2022 @ 4:00 PM, due to a conflict with the Court's calendar. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other the new date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this in person conference, and then file a letter application. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/31/2022. (MI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 10/31 12:17 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 12/5/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Thu 10/06 3:16 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The defendant's letter application11 dated 9/16/22 is GRANTED. An in person pre motion conference is scheduled for November 7, 2022 @ 4:00PM. The Court expects the parties to be conversant with the underlying facts and prepared to discuss the legal issues arising therefrom. The parties are reminded that they are obligated to discuss the prospect of settlement and may be required to provide the Court with a report of such discussions . If this date presents a conflict counsel shall first obtain the consent from all the parties to adjourn this in person pre-motion conference and then file a letter application. Upon receipt of this email counsel shall confirm with each other of the date and time of this in person pre-motion conference. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/6/2022. (MI)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 10/06 3:17 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: In Person Pre-Motion Conference set for 11/7/2022 04:00 PM before Judge Frederic Block. (MI)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
13 13 1 pgs motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/03 3:53 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Morgan Mickelsen as Counsel by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 10/03 4:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Granting Morgan L. Mickelsen's motion13 to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiff. Attorney Morgan L Mickelsen terminated. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 10/3/2022. (MI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
12 12 4 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 09/23 3:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
11 11 3 pgs motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 09/16 5:26 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference by Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School. (Miranda, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Thu 09/15 3:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School on August 5, 2022, filed by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 08/05 12:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School, filed by Roza Tachalov. (Mickelsen, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letter to NYCCHR
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/19 3:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Roza Tachalov. Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/17/2022. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard B. Epstein on behalf of Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School (aty to be noticed) (Epstein, Richard)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/19 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Anthony Miranda on behalf of Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School (aty to be noticed) (Miranda, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/12 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan L Mickelsen on behalf of Roza Tachalov (aty to be noticed) (Mickelsen, Morgan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/11 4:47 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/11 4:46 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/11 4:40 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Roza Tachalov (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/11 4:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Yeshiva Sha'Arei Zion Elementary School filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15736146 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Roza Tachalov. (Stevens, Brittany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Letter to NYCCHR
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/11 4:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla)
Related: [-]