California Central District Court
Judge:John F Walter
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 2:22-cv-04723
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:May 19, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 22STCV14125
Last checked: Saturday Jan 07, 2023 1:49 AM PST
Defendant
American Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew P Frederick
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Taylor D Horn
Morgan Lewis And Bockius LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Phillip Frazier
Represented By
James I Shin
C And B Law Group LLP
contact info
Frederick Lewis Stoker
C And B Law Group LLP
contact info
H Jack Bazerkanian
C And B Law Group LLP
contact info
Tiffany Ariavand
C And B Law Group LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Does
Terminated: 07/28/2022
Defendant
Moana Jeremia
Terminated: 07/28/2022


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, January 02, 2025
46 46 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 01/03 10:15 AM
MANDATE of Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 , CCA # 23-55508 The judgment of this Court, entered December 10, 2024, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. [See USCA Memorandum45 , AFFIRMED.](mat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
45 45 appeal USCA Memorandum/Opinion/Order Wed 12/11 8:21 AM
MEMORANDUM from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 filed by Phillip Frazier. CCA # 23-55508 The decision of the District Court is AFFIRMED.(mat)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
44 44 misc Bill of Costs (CV-59) - Issued Mon 07/31 11:08 AM
BILL OF COSTS. Costs Taxed in amount of $4,386.40 in favor of Defendant, American Airlines, Inc. and against Plaintiff, Phillip Frazier.36 ,37 (rmo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
43 43 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 06/21 12:08 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier, re Designation42 , Statement41 served on 6/19/2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
42 42 notice Notice (Other) Wed 06/21 12:06 PM
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier. (iv)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Statement Wed 06/21 12:00 PM
REPRESENTATIVE STATEMENT filed by plaintiff Phillip Frazier. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
40 40 appeal USCA Notification of Case Number Mon 06/12 4:08 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-55508 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 as to plaintiff Phillip Frazier. (mat)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2023
39 39 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 06/08 12:58 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Phillip Frazier, re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals38 served on 6/6/23. (mat)
Related: [-]
38 38 appeal Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Thu 06/08 12:50 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by plaintiff Phillip Frazier. Appeal of Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,34 Filed On: 5/15/23; Entered On: 5/16/23; Filing fee $ 505 paid. Receipt Number: 3425. (mat)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Fees Paid Wed 06/07 3:25 PM
APPEAL FEE PAID: as to Plaintiff Phillip Frazier; Receipt Number: 3425 in the amount of $505. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
37 37 motion Clerk to Tax Costs (CV-59) Thu 06/01 12:00 PM
APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against Plaintiff Phillip Frazier re: Judgment,36 , filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Removal Fee Itemization and Invoice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff Depo. Itemization, Invoice and Transcript Invoices for Diedrick, Mcmahan and Gonzalez
Friday, May 19, 2023
36 36 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 05/19 12:55 PM
JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF PHILLIP FRAZIER by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff shall take nothing from Defendant and the action is dismissed in its entirety. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff on the Plaintiff's Complaint. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
35 35 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 05/18 1:32 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 [PROPOSED] JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. AND AGAINST PLAINTIFF PHILLIP FRAZIER
Monday, May 15, 2023
34 34 order Summary Judgment Tue 05/16 9:05 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [filed 4/17/23; Docket No.23 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED. The parties are ordered to meet and confer and agree on a joint proposed Judgment which is consistent with this Order. The parties shall lodge the joint proposed Judgment with the Court on or before May 19, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
33 33 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/10 1:05 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING UNDER SUBMISSION DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT [filed 4/17/23;Docket No.23 ] by Judge John F. Walter. The Court finds that this matter is appropriate for decision without oral argument. The hearing calendared for May 15, 2023 is hereby vacated and the matter is taken off calendar. The matter will be deemed submitted on the vacated hearing date and the clerk will notify the parties when the Court has reached a decision. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 05/03 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Plaintiff's [Proposed] Statement of Decision re Objection/Opposition (Motion related),,,25(Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PLAINTIFFS [PROPOSED] STATEMENT OF DECISION ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
31 31 notice Notice of Lodging Wed 05/03 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed of Defendant's [Proposed] Statement of Decision Granting re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Statement of Decision Granting Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment
Monday, May 01, 2023
30 30 respm Exhibit to Motion Mon 05/01 12:15 PM
EXHIBIT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 JOINT SET OF EXHIBITS filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 1 - List of LAX Flight Service Management and Support Staff (June 2020),
Att: 2 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 2 - Email from Andy Patterson to Plaintiff re Termination (June 30, 2020),
Att: 3 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 3 - Medical Note from Dr. Bathgate re Plaintiff's Work Restrictions (August 28, 2015),
Att: 4 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 4 - Fleet Service Clerk Job Description (April 25, 2005),
Att: 5 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 5 - Letter from Lisa Valiente to Plaintiff re Clerk Customer Relations Position (October 18, 2016),
Att: 6 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 6 - Letter from Lisa Valiente to Plaintiff re Flight Service Coordinator Position (May 18, 2017),
Att: 7 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 7 - Emails between Plaintiff and Lisa Valiente re Flight Service Coordinator Position (May 2017),
Att: 8 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 8 - American Airlines Work Environment Policy (2020),
Att: 9 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 9 - American Airlines Work Environment Policy (2015 - 2019),
Att: 10 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 10 - General Release - COVID Reduction in Force (July 2020),
Att: 11 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 11 - Ages of LAX Flight Service Management and Support Staff (as of June 30, 2020),
Att: 12 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 12 - Investigation Close-Out Letter from Jim Oebker to Plaintiff (November 2020),
Att: 13 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 13 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript (March 1, 2013),
Att: 14 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 14 - Plaintiff's DFEH Complaint (January 28, 2016),
Att: 15 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 15 - Plaintiff's DFEH Right-to-Sue Notice (February 2, 2016),
Att: 16 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 16 - Plaintiff's EEOC Charge minus exhibits (April 20, 2016),
Att: 17 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 17 - EEOC Dismissal of Charge & Right-to-Sue Notice to Plaintiff (Dec. 20, 2019),
Att: 18 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 18 - Flight Service Coordinator Job Description,
Att: 19 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 19 - Notification from American to Plaintiff Under the WARN Act (July 16, 2020),
Att: 20 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 20 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Interrogatories, Set One (February 10, 2023),
Att: 21 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 21 - Letter Enclosing $750 Payment for Personnel Records Claims (April 13, 2023),
Att: 22 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 22 - Assembly Bill No. 9 Amending Fair Employment & Housing Act (2019),
Att: 23 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 23 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1, 2006 - December 31, 2017),
Att: 24 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 24 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1, 2018 - December 31, 2019),
Att: 25 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 25 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1, 2020),
Att: 26 Exhibit American Airlines Summary Judgment Exhibit No. 26 - Plaintiff's DFEH Complaint and Right-to-Sue Notice (May 4, 2021),
Att: 27 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 37 - Excerpts from Defendant's Responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories, Set One,
Att: 28 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 38 - 2018 Performance Conversation for Phillip H. Frazier,
Att: 29 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 39 - 2019 Performance Conversation Form for Phillip H. Frazier,
Att: 30 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 40 - Excerpts from Defendant's Responses to Interrogatories, Set Two,
Att: 31 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 41 - Email re FSC - Collateral dated September 30, 2019,
Att: 32 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 42 - Emails re Reimbursements dated August 2, 2019,
Att: 33 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 43 - Relevant Portions of Deposition of Timothy Mcmahan,
Att: 34 Exhibit Plaintiff Phillip Frazier's Opposition Exhibit No. 44 - Relevant Portions of Deposition of Phillip Frazier
29 29 respm Motion Related Document Mon 05/01 11:33 AM
JOINT SET OF DECLARATIONS re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Timothy Mcmahan,
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew Patterson,
Att: 3 Declaration of Lisa Valiente,
Att: 4 Declaration of Matthew Goder,
Att: 5 Declaration of James Oebker,
Att: 6 Declaration of Krystal Escobar,
Att: 7 Declaration of Andrew Brattini,
Att: 8 Declaration of Regina Pedroza,
Att: 9 Declaration of Andrew P. Frederick,
Att: 10 Declaration of Plaintiff Phillip Frazier,
Att: 11 Declaration of Tiffany Ariavand
28 28 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 05/01 10:58 AM
REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Combined Statement of Facts,
Att: 2 Defendant's Objections to Plaintiff's Summary Judgment Evidence,
Att: 3 Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/25 2:28 PM
Text Entry Order: Counsel have failed to provide the Court with Courtesy Copies for Docket Number26 that comply with paragraph 3(c) of the Courts Standing Order and paragraph 4(b) of the Courts Scheduling and Case Management Order (CMO). Counsel shall deliver Courtesy Copies that fully comply with the Courts Standing Order and CMO by April 27, 2023, or Docket Number26 will be stricken.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
26 26 respm Supplement (Motion related) Mon 04/24 3:55 PM
SUPPLEMENT to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 Compendium of Evidence filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier.(Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF PHILLIP FRAZIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF TIFFANY ARIAVAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 37: Excerpts from Defendant's Response to Interrogatories (Set One),
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 38: 2018 Performance Conversation for Phillip H. Frazier,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 39: 2019 Performance Coversation Form for Phillip H. Frazier,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 40: Excerpts from Defendant's Response to Interrogatories (Set Two),
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 41: Email re FSC - Collateral dated September 30, 2019,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 42: Email re Reimbursements dated July 29, 2019 - August 2, 2019,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 43: Relevant Portions of Deposition of Timothy McMahan,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 44: Relevant Portions fo Deposition of Phillip Frazier
25 25 respm Objection/Opposition (Motion related) Mon 04/24 3:36 PM
OPPOSITION OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier.(Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement PLAINTIFFS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 2 Supplement PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF GENUINE DISPUTES AND ADDITIONAL FACTS,
Att: 3 Supplement DEPOSITION CITATIONS OF PHILLIP FRAZIER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT,
Att: 4 Supplement DEPOSITION CITATIONS OF TIMOTHY J. MCMAHAN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT AMERICAN AIRLINES INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Monday, April 17, 2023
24 24 misc Appendix Mon 04/17 12:17 PM
APPENDIX filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint 23 Compendium of Evidence in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Timothy Mcmahan,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - List of LAX Flight Service Managers and Support Staff (June 2020),
Att: 3 Declaration of Andrew Patterson,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2 - Email from Andy Patterson to Plaintiff re Termination (June 30, 2020),
Att: 5 Declaration of Lisa Valiente,
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Medical Note from Dr. Bathgate re Plaintiff's Work Restrictions (August 28, 2015),
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 - Fleet Service Clerk Job Description (April 25, 2005),
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 - Letter from Lisa Valiente to Plaintiff re Clerk Customer Relations Position (October 18, 2016),
Att: 9 Exhibit 6 - Letter from Lisa Valiente to Plaintiff re Flight Service Coordinator Position (May 18, 2017),
Att: 10 Exhibit 7 - Emails between Plaintiff and Lisa Valiente re Flight Service Coordinator Position (May 2017),
Att: 11 Exhibit 8 - American Airlines Work Environment Policy (2020),
Att: 12 Exhibit 9 - American Airlines Work Environment Policy (2015 - 2019),
Att: 13 Declaration of Matthew Goder,
Att: 14 Exhibit 10 - General Release -- COVID Reduction in Force (July 2020),
Att: 15 Exhibit 11 - Ages of LAX Flight Service Management and Support Staff (as of June 30, 2020),
Att: 16 Declaration of James Oebker,
Att: 17 Exhibit 12 - Investigation Close-Out Letter from Jim Oebker to Plaintiff (November 2020),
Att: 18 Declaration of Krystal Escobar,
Att: 19 Declaration of Andrew Brattini,
Att: 20 Declaration of Regina Pedroza,
Att: 21 Declaration of Andrew Frederick,
Att: 22 Exhibit 13 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript (March 1 2013),
Att: 23 Exhibit 14 - Plaintiff's DFEH Complaint (January 28, 2016),
Att: 24 Exhibit 15 - Plaintiff's DFEH Right-to-Sue Notice (February 2, 2016),
Att: 25 Exhibit 16 - Plaintiff's EEOC Charge minus exhibits (April 20, 2016),
Att: 26 Exhibit 17 - EEOC Dismissal of Charge & Right-to-Sue Notice to Plaintiff (Dec. 20, 2019),
Att: 27 Exhibit 18 - Flight Service Coordinator Job Description,
Att: 28 Exhibit 19 - Notification from American to Plaintiff Under the WARN Act (July 16, 2020),
Att: 29 Exhibit 20 - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Interrogatories Set One (February 10 2023),
Att: 30 Exhibit 21 - Letter Enclosing $750 Payment for Personnel Records Claims (April 13, 2023),
Att: 31 Request for Judicial Notice,
Att: 32 Exhibit 22 - Assembly Bill No. 9 Amending Fair Employment Housing Act (2019),
Att: 33 Exhibit 23 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1 2006 - December 31 2017),
Att: 34 Exhibit 24 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1 2018 - December 31 2019),
Att: 35 Exhibit 25 - California Government Code section 12960 (January 1 2020),
Att: 36 Exhibit 26 - Plaintiff's DFEH Complaint and Right-to-Sue Notice (May 4 2021)
23 23 motion Summary Judgment Mon 04/17 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's Causes of Action in his Complaint filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion,
Att: 2 Statement of Uncontroverted Facts and Conclusions of Law in Support of Defendant's Summary Judgment Motion,
Att: 3 Deposition Citations of Plaintiff's Testimony in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment,
Att: 4 Proposed Judgment
Thursday, March 30, 2023
22 22 misc Statement Thu 03/30 11:48 AM
STATEMENT ON LOCAL RULE 7-3 CONFERENCE RE: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
21 21 misc Report Wed 03/29 2:40 PM
JOINT REPORT of RESULTS OF MEDIATION filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
20 20 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Thu 07/28 4:03 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/4/2023 at 8:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 8/11/2023 at 8:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/22/2023 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 07/28 4:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier (Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Declaration Thu 07/28 4:00 PM
DECLARATION of Tiffany Ariavand Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier. (Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) Thu 07/28 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Moana Jeremia. (Ariavand, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12) ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Hearings Thu 07/28 3:53 PM
ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION, and DISMISSING ANY UNSERVED DOE DEFENDANTS by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on August 8, 2022 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice toParties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: March 27, 2023.The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: March 31, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
15 15 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 07/27 10:45 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc... (Horn, Taylor)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
14 14 misc Supplement Wed 07/20 4:07 PM
SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,4 filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Superior Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 First Amended General Order re Mandatory Electronic Filing,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 Notice of Case Management Conference,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 Proof of Personal Service,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Answer by Def. American Airlines, Inc. - Superior Court Action
13 13 misc Declaration Wed 07/20 3:38 PM
DECLARATION of Lead Trial Counsel filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc.. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 07/20 3:35 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc., served on July 12, 2022. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/12 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for August 8, 2022 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before July 27, 2022. The title page of the Joint Report must state the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. See minute order for details. (lom)
Related: [-]
10 10 22 pgs order Order Tue 07/12 10:06 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
Related: [-]
textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 07/12 10:06 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING DOES: Pursuant to Local Rule 19-1, no complaint or petition shall be filed that includes more than ten Doe or fictitiously named parties. Accordingly, the Court hereby dismisses the action as to Doe Defendants 11 through 50, inclusive. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sr)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
8 8 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/11 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments: # 9 Civil Cover Sheet not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. The document(s) should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs.. (sh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 07/11 3:53 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 07/11 3:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 07/11 3:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/11 3:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV14125 with filing fee previously paid ($402.00 paid on 07/11/2022, receipt number 33608760), filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc..(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal,
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal,
Att: 6 Declaration of Caroline Ray in Support of Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court,
Att: 7 Declaration of Kenneth Daniel Cleverly in Support of Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Notice of Removal to Federal Court,
Att: 8 Declaration of Moana Jeremia in Support of Defendant American Airlines, Inc.'s Notice of Removal of Action to Federal Court,
Att: 9 3 pgs Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 07/11 2:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties1 served on July 11, 2022. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/11 2:47 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. identifying American Airlines Group Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/11 2:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc., identifying American Airlines Group Inc.. (Attorney Andrew P Frederick added to party American Airlines, Inc.(pty:dft))(Frederick, Andrew)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 07/11 3:35 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Airlines, Inc., Does, Moana Jeremia. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier.[FILED IN STATE COURT 04/28/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL4 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Mon 07/11 3:44 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Phillip Frazier, upon Defendant American Airlines, Inc. served on 6/9/2022. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned.[FILED IN STATE COURT 06/27/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 4 EXHIBIT D TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL4 ] (sh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/11 3:46 PM
CONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant American Airlines, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT 07/08/2022 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 5 EXHIBIT E TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL4 ](sh)
Related: [-]