Washington Western District Court
Judge:Tiffany M Cartwright
Case #: 3:22-cv-05499
Nature of Suit375 Other Statutes - False Claims Act
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Case in other court:9th Circuit Court of Appeals, 25-00605
Last checked: Saturday Jan 07, 2023 1:23 AM PST
Defendant
Robert Axelrod
Represented By
Allyson S Krueger
Dunn Carney LLP
contact info
Lauren J Russell
Dunn Carney LLP
contact info
Defendant
PeaceHealth
Represented By
Grace K Thompson
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Christie S Totten
Davis Wright Tremaine LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Adelstein
Represented By
Jose A Klein
Klein Munsinger LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica Brunelle
Represented By
Jose A Klein
Klein Munsinger LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
171 171 order 2 - Minute Order Tue 04/22 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER. On April 14, 2025, the Court received a request from Plaintiff Adelstein via email to unseal the documents filed at Dkt.79 and80 . Because this matter is now on appeal, the parties are directed to follow Ninth Circuit Rule 27-13 with respect to sealing or unsealing documents in the record for appeal.Authorized by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MDH)
Related: [-]