Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Carlota M Bohm
Case #: 2:22-bk-21334
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022

Debtor
Altmeyer Home Stores, Inc.
6515 State Route 22
Delmont, PA 15626-2402
Represented By
Kathryn L. Harrison
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Robert H. Slone, Trustee
223 South Maple Avenue
Greensburg, PA 15601
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
Liberty Center. 1001 Liberty Avenue, Suite 970
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 07/12/2022 12:02 AM EDT
Monday, July 11, 2022
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Mon 07/11 4:16 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $338 Filed by Altmeyer Home Stores, Inc. Government Proof of Claim due by 01/7/2023. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 07/25/2022. Atty Disclosure Statement due 07/25/2022. Declaration of Schedules due 07/25/2022. Employee Income Record or a statement that there is no record due by 07/25/2022. Schedule A/B due 07/25/2022. Schedule D due 07/25/2022. Schedule E/F due 07/25/2022. Schedule G due 07/25/2022. Schedule H due 07/25/2022. Statement of Financial Affairs due 07/25/2022. Summary of schedules due 07/25/2022. Incomplete Filings due by 07/25/2022. (Harrison, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Mon 07/11 4:17 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Altmeyer Home Stores, Inc. (Harrison, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 07/11 4:19 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 7([LINK 22-21334 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00) filing fee. Receipt number A15980325, amount $ 338.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]