Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:22-cr-00228
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 12, 2022 3:17 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lance Barabas (1)
Terminated: 07/11/2022


Docket last updated: 07/12/2022 3:22 AM EDT
Monday, July 11, 2022
1 1 TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION documents for Probation received as to Lance Barabas from Eastern District of Tennessee.(CTR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 Indictment,
Att: 3 Plea Agreement,
Att: 4 Judgment