New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vernon S Broderick
Case #: 1:22-cv-05916
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12111 Americans with Disabilities Act - Employment
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2022
Terminated:Dec 28, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2023 4:12 AM EST
Defendant
M Moser Associates LLC
Represented By
Mark A. Beckman
Gordon & Rees , LLP
contact info
Dahn A Levine
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Sterns
Represented By
Yuting Li
Danny Grace PC
contact info
Douglas Mace
Danny Grace, PLLC
contact info
Daniel Joseph Grace
Danny Grace PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
19 19 1 pgs order Order of Discontinuance Wed 12/28 11:42 AM
ORDER: The parties in this matter reported that they had reached a settlement in principle and requested 45 days to file a stipulation of dismissal. They were ordered to file that stipulation by December 26, 2022. (Doc. 18.) While they have not filed this stipulation, they have reached an agreement in principle. Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's docket if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/28/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
18 18 order Memo Endorsement Wed 11/09 10:10 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:17 Letter filed by M Moser Associates LLC. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. The parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal by December 26, 2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/8/2022) (kgo)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
17 17 misc Letter Mon 11/07 4:36 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mark A. Beckman dated November 7, 2022 re: (M Moser Associates LLC) Letter to Court re - Settlement-in-Principle. Document filed by M Moser Associates LLC..(Beckman, Mark)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 11/07 11:40 AM
ORDER re:15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant has not responded to the complaint. Plaintiff, however, has taken no action to prosecute this case. Accordingly, if Plaintiff intends to seek a default judgment, she is directed to do so in accordance with Rule 4(H) of my Individual Rules and Practices in Civil Cases by no later than November 11, 2022. If Plaintiff fail to do so or otherwise demonstrate that she intends to prosecute this litigation, I may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/7/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 19, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 10/19 12:00 PM
ORDER granting14 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re14 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2022 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mark A. Beckman dated October 18, 2022. APPLICATION GRANTED SO ORDERED. M Moser Associates LLC answer due 10/31/2022. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 10/19/2022) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 18, 2022
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 10/18 4:52 PM
SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 31, 2022 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mark A. Beckman dated October 18, 2022. Document filed by M Moser Associates LLC..(Beckman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 09/23 1:44 PM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/23/2022) (ks)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/22 8:43 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dahn A Levine on behalf of M Moser Associates LLC..(Levine, Dahn)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 09/22 8:41 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Mark A. Beckman dated September 22, 2022. Document filed by M Moser Associates LLC..(Beckman, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/22 8:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of M Moser Associates LLC..(Beckman, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/19 11:08 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Mace on behalf of Sarah Sterns..(Mace, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/09 5:27 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. M Moser Associates LLC waiver sent on 7/28/2022, answer due 9/26/2022. Document filed by Sarah Sterns..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Thu 07/14 4:11 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M Moser Associates LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 07/14 10:39 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M Moser Associates LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sarah Sterns..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
5 5 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/13 10:51 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/13 9:05 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Yuting Li to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; Jury Demand code was not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 07/13 9:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Yuting Li. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: SARAH STERNS; M MOSER ASSOCIATES LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 07/13 9:08 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 07/13 9:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/13 9:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 07/13 9:12 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Yuting Li to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name whom summons is for must be listed on the 'as to' docket entry text;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/12 3:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by SARAH STERNS..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/12 3:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/12 11:50 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yuting Li on behalf of SARAH STERNS..(Li, Yuting)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/12 4:32 AM
COMPLAINT against M MOSER ASSOCIATES LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26397639)Document filed by SARAH STERNS..(Grace, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - JOB OFFER