Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Pfizer Inc. et al
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Colm F Connolly |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00924 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2023 3:30 AM EST |
Defendant
BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH
|
|
Defendant
BioNTech SE
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 08/10 10:01 AM
SO ORDERED, re (20 in 1:22-cv-00336-CFC), (8 in 1:22-cv-00924-CFC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Case Consolidation . The -336 Action shall be the lead case and all future filings shall be made only in the -336 action. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/9/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00336-CFC, 1:22-cv-00924-CFC(nmf) |
|
utility
Create Case Association - dkt in member case for Consol or MDL
Wed 08/10 10:30 AM
Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:22-cv-00336-CFC. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 22-CV-336-CFC ONLY. (nmf) |
||
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Consolidate Cases
Thu 07/28 3:51 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases Proposed Stipulation and Order Regarding Case Consolidation - filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Townsend, Ethan) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
utility
Add Attorneys - PHV only
Thu 07/21 2:28 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney William G. Gaede, III, Sarah Chapin Columbia, Sarah J. Fischer, and Ian B. Brooks for Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00924-CFC, 1:22-cv-00925-CFC(mpb) |
||
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/20 12:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00924-CFC, 1:22-cv-00925-CFC (rjb) |
||
order
SO ORDERED
Wed 07/20 3:12 PM
SO ORDERED, re (7 in 1:22-cv-00924-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Gaede, Sarah Chapin Columbia, Ian B. Brooks, Sarah J. Fischer filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc., (8 in 1:22-cv-00925-CFC) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Gaede, Sarah Chapin Columbia, Ian B. Brooks, Sarah Fischer filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 7/20/2022. Associated Cases: 1:22-cv-00924-CFC, 1:22-cv-00925-CFC(nmf) |
||
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 07/15 10:42 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Gaede, Sarah Chapin Columbia, Ian B. Brooks, Sarah J. Fischer - filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Townsend, Ethan) |
|
Wednesday, July 13, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/13 2:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Townsend, Ethan) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/13 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Pfizer Inc. served on 7/13/2022, answer due 8/3/2022. (Townsend, Ethan) |
|
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
Tue 07/12 1:19 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (mpb) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents
Tue 07/12 1:18 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 11,382,979 B1. (mpb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Magistrate Consent Forms
Tue 07/12 1:17 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mpb) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/12 1:16 PM
COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against BioNTech Manufacturing GmbH, BioNTech SE, Pfizer Inc., Pharmacia & Upjohn Co. LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3913675.) - filed by Alnylam Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(mpb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-11, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 12-26, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 27-34, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
No Summons Issued
Tue 07/12 1:19 PM
No Summons Issued. (mpb) |