Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Jon E Deguilio
Case #: 3:22-mc-00022
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2022
Terminated:Sep 09, 2022

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 43 minutes ago
Thursday, December 21, 2023
8 8 6 pgs order Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline Fri 01/05 12:08 PM
ORDER dated 12/19/2023 from Indiana Supreme Court imposing the following discipline regarding Marco Antonio Genesis Moreno: Respondent is disbarred from the practice of law in this state effective immediately. Per Curiam Opinion. Chief Justice Rush and Justices Massa, Slaughter, Goff, and Molter concur. (rk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
7 7 misc Mail Returned Thu 09/29 1:54 PM
Mail Returned from Marco A. Moreno as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known -4 Order. (nal)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
6 6 misc Mail Returned Tue 09/20 12:26 PM
Mail Returned from Marco A. Moreno as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Attempted - Not Known - Unable to Forward -4 Order. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline Fri 09/09 12:44 PM
ORDER dated 09/01/2022 from Indiana Supreme Court imposing the following discipline regarding Marco A. Genesis Moreno: Respondent is indefinitely suspended from the practice of law for repeatedly failing to cooperate with the disciplinary process, effective immediately. Signed by Loretta H. Rush, Chief Justice of Indiana. All Justices concur. (rk)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Imposing Disciplinary Action Fri 09/09 11:28 AM
ORDER IMPOSING DISCIPLINARY ACTION regarding attorney Marco A. Genesis Moreno. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-6.8(c), Respondent-Attorney Marco A. Genesis Moreno is hereby suspended from the practice of law before the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. Reinstatement shall be governed by the provisions of Local Rule 83-6.11. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 09/09/2022. (Copy mailed to 120 E. Market Street, Suite 600, Indianapolis, IN 46204; and One American Square, Suite 2500, Indianapolis, IN 46282) (rk)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
3 3 misc Mail Returned Mon 07/25 4:43 PM
Mail Returned from Marco A Moreno as Undeliverable - Return to Sender - Not Deliverable as Addressed - Unable to Forward -2 Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline. (jdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
2 2 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline Tue 07/12 3:34 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re1 Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline, in attorney disciplinary matter regarding attorney Marco A. Genesis Moreno. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-6.8(b), the Court gives the Respondent thirty (30) days after service of this Order within which to show cause why the imposition of reciprocal discipline by this Court would be unwarranted. The Clerk shall provide a copy of this Order to the Respondent in accordance with N.D. Ind. L.R. 83-6.12. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 07/12/22. (Copy mailed to 120 E. Market Street, Suite 600, Indianapolis, IN 46204; and One American Square, Suite 2500, Indianapolis, IN 46282)(rk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
1 1 1 pgs order Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline Tue 07/12 11:08 AM
ORDER dated 06/29/2022 from Indiana Supreme Court imposing the following discipline regarding Marco A. Genesis Moreno: Respondent is suspended from the practice of law for noncooperation with the Commission, effective immediately. Signed by Loretta H. Rush, Chief Justice of Indiana. All Justices concur. (rk)
Related: [-]