Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:20-bk-32519

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Marvin Isgur
Case #: 4:22-ap-03216
Nature of Suit91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2022
Terminated:Dec 15, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
MYT Holding LLC
Represented By
MYT Holding LLC
contact info
Defendant
MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc.
Represented By
MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P.
Represented By
Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P.
Represented By
Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Ares Management LLC
Represented By
Ares Management LLC
contact info
Defendant
Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc.
Represented By
Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Cede & Co.
Represented By
Cede & Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mohsin Meghji, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
Richard M. Pachulski
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kornfeld
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Michael D Warner
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
court Case Reassigned-Adversary Tue 10/17 2:42 PM
Judge Marvin Isgur added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/15 11:32 AM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-3216 Closed. (AlbertAlonzo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
19 19 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/25 4:40 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding Against Defendant Cede & Co. Filed by Mohsin Meghji (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 08/25 4:36 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding Against MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, And Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc. Filed by Mohsin Meghji (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 14, 2022
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 08/14 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 08/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Generic Order
Thursday, August 11, 2022
16 16 order Generic Order Fri 08/12 12:22 PM
Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Liquidating Trustee's Complaint for Declaratory Relief Signed on 8/11/2022 Related [+] (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation, Proposed Order
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/11 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hugh Massey Ray III Filed by on behalf of Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc. (Ray, Hugh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
14 14 notice Notice Tue 08/09 2:32 AM
Notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service . Filed by Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc. (Mokrzycka, Maria)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
13 13 misc Proposed Order Fri 08/05 11:52 AM
Stipulation By Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc., MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc., Mohsin Meghji and. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes., Proposed Order RE: Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to Respond to Liquidating Trustee's Complaint for Declaratory Relief (Filed By Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc., MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc., Mohsin Meghji ). (Harrison, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
12 12 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 4:00 PM
Summons Service Executed on MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc. 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:59 PM
Summons Service Executed on MYT Holding LLC 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc. 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:55 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ares Management LLC 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P. 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:52 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P. 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/18 3:51 PM
Summons Service Executed on Cede & Co. 7/14/2022. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/14 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/14/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 07/12 12:45 PM
Summons Issued on Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P. Date Issued 7/12/2022; Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P. Date Issued 7/12/2022; Ares Management LLC Date Issued 7/12/2022; Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc. Date Issued 7/12/2022; Cede & Co. Date Issued 7/12/2022; MYT Holding LLC Date Issued 7/12/2022; MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc. Date Issued 7/12/2022. (hler)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Tue 07/12 6:00 AM
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
2 2 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Mon 07/11 8:59 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE) Inc., and Cede & Co.. (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Mon 07/11 8:40 PM
Adversary case 22-03216 Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Mohsin Meghji against MYT Holding LLC, MYT Ultimate Parent, Inc., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund III, L.P., Ares Corporate Opportunities Fund IV, L.P., Ares Management LLC, Canada Pension Plan Investment Board (USRE), Inc., Cede & Co.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet