Albright et al v. Ascension Michigan et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jane M Beckering |
Referred: | Phillip J Green |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00638 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Jun 25, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2023 3:40 AM EST |
defendant
Ascension Borgess Allegan Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Borgess Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Borgess-Lee Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Brighton Center for Recovery
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Genesys Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Macomb-Oakland Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Michigan
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Providence
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Providence Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Providence Rochester Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension River District Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension St. John Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension St. Joseph Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension St. Mary's Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Standish Hospital
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Ascension Borgess-Pipp Hospital
|
Represented By
|
mediator
Facilitative Mediator
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lisa Allen
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Melissa Arai
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Marc Brannon
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kirk Brown
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Stacey Buc
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Nancy Callow
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Marie Chapman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dazhia Chavez
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Teresa DeMerell
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Debra Duvall
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
David Edwards
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Deborah Fry
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Gina Gangnier
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Molly Gorniewicz
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michelle Hamilton
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Christine Haskin
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dana Hatfield
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kathleen Hawley
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Diane Hickox
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Thomas Howard
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Breanne Hunter
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michele Igram
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Rose Irish
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Rosemary Jones
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jared Kopydlowski
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cherie Lackowski
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Mary LeMerise
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Heather Lipkowitz
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Shelby McPherson
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Shanda Middleton
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Rachel Moore
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lynn Morrison
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Karen Munson
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Luke Myers
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Colleen Nitschke
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kathleen Nugent
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Scott Obertein
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Renee Ostrander
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michelle Owen
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Julie Poteracki
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cody Reed
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michelle Rossie
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Deborah Roszatycki
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kaitlyn Russcher
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Peter Sagmoe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jennifer Seals
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Theresa Shaw
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dawn Spencer
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Andrea Strobel
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Maria Syjud
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dorothy Thompson
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Emmy Tuttle
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Robert Tworek
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kimberly Tylenda
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cameron Vander Stel
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Scott Walker
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Laura Waltz
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lisa Wilczak
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cindia Wong
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cheryl Zabaroni
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Sarah Zuziak
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Karen Albright
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Sarah Andrews
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Mary Audia-Vallier
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Austin Boyes
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Lisa Brannon
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Karen Buchanan
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Luke Bueche
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Gretchen Cabral
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Michael Cormier
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Mary Cornish
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Amber Coughlin
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Tabatha Cronander
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Olivia Dais
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Tracy Emory
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Linda Ennis
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Chelsea Forrest
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Tonia Fults
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Gisella Gamicchia
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Mary Hrecho
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Christy Hupman
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Maureen Husted
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Staci Kaniszewski
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Barbara Kehoe
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Tammy Krause
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Betty Lawrie
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jenna Leggett
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cindy McMurphy
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Kristen Measel-Miller
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Greta Natzel
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Cherrie Nees
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Anna Neuner
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Laura O'Meara
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Tracy Olldashi
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Carole Palazzolo
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Marisa Pariaroli O'Brien
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Elizabeth Parus
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Jessica Pawelek
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Brita Pietila
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Beverly Post
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Pawel Pulawski
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Nancy Ruonavaara-Ingram
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Dona Rutherford
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Allore Sharp
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Adrienne Silvestri
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Sue Story
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Sandra Vander Lugt
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Donnette Vandermeer
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Amy Webb
|
Represented By
|
plaintiff
Daniel Yoder
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 18, 2025 | ||
205 | 205
![]() ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal202 Order filed; case number 24-2054 granting motion to dismiss case - voluntarily (mlc) |
|
204 | 204
![]() ORDER of USCA (certified copy) re appeal173 Order filed; case number 24-1750 granting motion to dismiss case - voluntarily (mlc) |