Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Linda V Parker
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:22-cv-11589
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Terminated:Feb 09, 2023
Case in other court:Oakland County Circuit Court, 22-194776-CB
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 3:49 AM EST
Defendant
Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc.
Represented By
John David Black
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Yourke
Represented By
Heidi T. Sharp
The Sharp Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, February 09, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 02/09 1:19 PM
STIPULATED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND WITHOUT COSTS Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 31, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Sat 12/31 5:48 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc.. (Black, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
6 6 order Stipulation and Order Wed 08/24 11:52 AM
STIPULATED ORDER STAYING ALL CASE DEADLINES Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
order Text-Only Order Wed 08/24 11:48 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Plaintiff filed an amended complaint5 on August 10, 2022. Accordingly, Defendant's4 is DENIED as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
5 5 19 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Wed 08/10 4:55 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tracy Yourke against Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc.. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Sharp, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
4 4 motion Dismiss Wed 07/20 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss COUNTS II AND III OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc.. (Black, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Smith v. Digital Equip. Corp.,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Burns v. Stanford Bros.
Thursday, July 14, 2022
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 07/14 1:18 PM
ORDER REGARDING REMOVAL. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (AFla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
2 2 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 07/13 11:49 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc. (Black, John)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Wed 07/13 11:46 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Organicell Regenerative Medicine, Inc. from Oakland County Circuit Court, case number 2022-194776-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8977544 - Fee: $ 402 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Black, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 26 pgs Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Wed 07/13 3:45 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (LGra)
Related: [-]