Washington Western District Court
Judge:John H Chun
Case #: 2:22-cv-00965
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 12:39 AM PST
Defendant
Amazon.com Inc
Represented By
Stephen M Rummage
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Amy J Mauser
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc)
contact info
William A Isaacson
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc)
contact info
Karen L Dunn
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc)
contact info
MaryAnn T Almeida
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Martha L Goodman
Paul Weiss Rifkind Wharton & Garrison Llp (dc)
contact info
John Goldmark
Davis Wright Tremaine (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
David Atwood
Represented By
Adam Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (la)
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman Llc (tx)
contact info
Jessica B Beringer
Keller Postman Llc (il)
contact info
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Mary E Sikora
Keller Postman Llc (dc)
contact info
Aaron Lawrence
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Nicolas Siebert
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
David Du LeRay
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steig Olson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Barbara Mahoney
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Brown
Represented By
Adam Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (la)
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman Llc (tx)
contact info
Jessica B Beringer
Keller Postman Llc (il)
contact info
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Mary E Sikora
Keller Postman Llc (dc)
contact info
Aaron Lawrence
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Nicolas Siebert
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
David Du LeRay
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steig Olson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Barbara Mahoney
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Graeber
Represented By
Adam Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (la)
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman Llc (tx)
contact info
Jessica B Beringer
Keller Postman Llc (il)
contact info
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Mary E Sikora
Keller Postman Llc (dc)
contact info
Aaron Lawrence
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Nicolas Siebert
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
David Du LeRay
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steig Olson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Barbara Mahoney
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Loes
Represented By
Adam Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (la)
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman Llc (tx)
contact info
Jessica B Beringer
Keller Postman Llc (il)
contact info
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Mary E Sikora
Keller Postman Llc (dc)
contact info
Aaron Lawrence
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Nicolas Siebert
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
David Du LeRay
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steig Olson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Barbara Mahoney
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Plaintiff
Leticia Shaw
Represented By
Adam Wolfson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (la)
contact info
Zina Bash
Keller Postman Llc (tx)
contact info
Jessica B Beringer
Keller Postman Llc (il)
contact info
Alicia Cobb
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (wa)
contact info
Mary E Sikora
Keller Postman Llc (dc)
contact info
Aaron Lawrence
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info
Nicolas Siebert
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
David Du LeRay
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Steig Olson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan Llp (ny)
contact info
Barbara Mahoney
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (wa)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
188 188 motion Appoint Thu 05/08 7:16 PM
MOTION to Appoint a Special Discovery Master to Address Privilege Disputes , filed by Defendant Amazon.com Inc. Noting Date 5/29/2025, (Goldmark, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
187 187 6 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion Wed 05/07 4:03 PM
ORDER granting186 Stipulated Motion and [Proposed] Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule . Signed by Judge John H. Chun. (MJV)
Related: [-]
186 186 7 pgs motion Stipulated Motion Wed 05/07 2:46 PM
Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule , filed by Plaintiffs David Atwood, Christopher Brown, Scott Graeber, Laura Loes, Leticia Shaw. Noting Date 5/7/2025, (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]