Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:22-cv-00050
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 1:33 AM MST
Defendant
Christian McCoy
Defendant
McCoy Excavation
Defendant
Petra
Plaintiff
Acuity
Represented By
Ryan T. Heuwinkel
Bohyer, Erickson, Beaudette & Tranel, P.C.
contact info
John E. Bohyer
Bohyer, Erickson, Beaudette & Tranel, P.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 14 2022
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2022. (ACC)
GPO Nov 28 2022
JUDGMENT in favor of Acuity against McCoy Excavation, Petra, Christian McCoy. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/28/2022. (KAH)

Docket last updated: 50 minutes ago
Monday, June 03, 2024
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Mon 06/03 10:48 AM
Terminate answer deadlines. (SAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 28, 2022
18 18 order Judgment Mon 11/28 3:59 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Acuity against McCoy Excavation, Petra, Christian McCoy. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/28/2022. (KAH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 23, 2022
17 17 motion Order/Judgment - MT Wed 11/23 12:06 PM
MOTION for Order/Judgment Ryan T. Heuwinkel appearing for Plaintiff Acuity (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Prop Judgment
Monday, November 14, 2022
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 11/14 9:51 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/14/2022. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
minutes Motion Hearing - SDM Thu 11/10 4:29 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Counsel Ryan Heuwinkel appearing in person for Plaintiff. Motion Hearing held on 11/10/2022 re 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Acuity. Counsel with argument. Matter submitted to court. Hearing commenced at 11:18 am and concluded at 11:24 am. (Court Reporter Y. Heinze.) (Law Clerk: E. Hodges), (Hearing held in Butte, MT) (SMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
minutes Telephonic Status Conference Wed 10/26 2:20 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/24/2022. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
order Order Setting - MT Thu 10/20 3:35 PM
TEXT Order Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/24/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. The call-in number is as follows: 877-402-9753; access code: 5136505. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/20/2022. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
order Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM Tue 10/04 2:57 PM
TEXT ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion6 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 11/10/2022 at 11:00 AM in Butte, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2022. (SLL)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/03 11:19 AM
NOTICE by Acuity re6 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Defendants' Positions (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/03 9:59 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on McCoy Excavation on 09/27/2022, filed by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/03 9:57 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Christian McCoy on 09/27/2022, filed by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM Mon 10/03 10:39 AM
Set Answer ddl: Christian McCoy answer due 10/11/2022; McCoy Excavation answer due 10/11/2022. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
8 8 misc Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT Fri 09/16 11:06 AM
Statement of Undisputed Fact re:6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Acuity filed by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Claim Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - July 13 letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Aug 23 Email
7 7 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 09/16 11:03 AM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Summary Judgment - SDM Fri 09/16 11:02 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Ryan T. Heuwinkel appearing for Plaintiff Acuity (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/09 10:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Petra Inc. on 08/31/2022, filed by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM Fri 09/09 11:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Petra answer due 9/21/2022. (SLR)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/29 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel is directed to download and print Summonses for service. (SLR)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Submission of Proposed Summons - MT Mon 08/29 9:57 AM
Submission of Proposed Summons as to All Defendants, re1 Complaint (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/13 4:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Acuity. (Heuwinkel, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - SDM Wed 07/13 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by Acuity. (HEG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A - Arbitration Demand,
Att: 2 Ex B - Policy,
Att: 3 Ex C - 6/29/22 Letter,
Att: 4 Ex D - 7/5/22 Letter,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 07/13 2:58 PM
Filing fee received: $ 402, receipt number AMTDC-2903002 (HEG)
Related: [-]