Connecticut District Court
Judge:Kari A Dooley
Case #: 3:22-cv-00866
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Dec 06, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 04, 2023 4:21 AM EST
Defendant
Eric Herman Opin
Defendant
Otoniel Reyes
Defendant
M. Jodi Rell
Defendant
Reichman Brodie Real Estate LLC
Defendant
Reichman Brodie Real Estate
Defendant
Rafael Ramos
Defendant
RBC DE2 LLC
Defendant
RBC DE LLC
Defendant
Carl M. Porto, II
Defendant
Joann Peterson
Defendant
Patrice Palumbo
Defendant
Richrach Properties-Hobart ST LLC
Defendant
City of New Haven
Defendant
Ouida V Nelson-Johnson
Defendant
Serena Neal-Sanjurjo
Defendant
National Construction LLC
Defendant
Nicole Minervini
Defendant
Mendez
Defendant
Elizabeth McCormack
Defendant
Robert Maturo
Defendant
Dannel Malloy
Defendant
Streeto
Defendant
Terence A. Zemetis
Defendant
Mark Wilson
Defendant
Thomas White
Defendant
David Whidden
Defendant
Robert Walsh
Defendant
Tyisha Walker-Myers
Defendant
Frank B Velardi, Jr
Defendant
Ikechukwu Umeugo
Defendant
Jim Turico
Defendant
Luretha McClendon
Defendant
Ronald Smith
Defendant
Michael B Smart
Defendant
Robert Singer
Defendant
Arlevia Samuel
Defendant
Regina Rush-Kittle
Defendant
Steven R. Rolnick
Defendant
S. Rodriguez
Defendant
Richard A. Robinson
Defendant
Andrew J. Rizzo, Jr
Defendant
John Anthony Cirello
Defendant
Frank Limon
Defendant
Judith Rothschild Dicine
Defendant
James S Del Visco
Defendant
John DeStefano, Jr.
Defendant
Linda Davis-Cannon
Defendant
Frank D'Amore , Jr
Defendant
Murtha Cullina
Defendant
Ricardo Cruz-Martinez
Defendant
Benjamin Conner
Defendant
State of Connecticut
Defendant
Dolores Colon
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Christine J Ciociola
Defendant
Nicholas Caprio
Defendant
Joseph Cappucci
Defendant
Brock & Scott PLLC
Defendant
William H. Bright, Jr.
Defendant
Denise Blanchard
Defendant
Berrios
Defendant
Debra Beard
Defendant
Robert E Artis
Defendant
James W. Abrams
Defendant
Gary Hogan
Defendant
James M. Lewis
Defendant
Ned Lamont
Defendant
M. Koval
Defendant
Patricia King
Defendant
Michael Johnson
Defendant
Erik Johnson
Defendant
Karle R Jacobson
Defendant
Michelle L. Hummer
Defendant
Renee Dominguez
Defendant
Toni Harp
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, NA
Defendant
Carl Goldfield
Defendant
Farren Moishe LLC
Defendant
Dean Esserman
Defendant
A. Walter Esdaile
Defendant
Ferdinand S Escoffery
Defendant
Justin Elicker
Plaintiff
Shannon Nkrumah
8 Oberlin Road
Hamden, CT 06514
Plaintiff
Kwame Nkrumah
8 Oberlin Road
Hamden, CT 06514
Plaintiff
Cheryl Noldon
435 Santa Monica
San Leandro, CA 94579
Plaintiff
Carolyn Woodson
435 Santa Monica
San Leandro, CA 94579
Plaintiff
Lula Woodson
8 Oberlin Road
Hamden, CT 06514


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/07 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Kwame Nkrumah, Shannon Nkrumah, Cheryl Noldon, Carolyn Woodson, Lula Woodson. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
order Order Dismissing Case Mon 10/31 11:53 AM
ORDER. The Court has reviewed the file in this case to monitor the Plaintiffs' compliance with Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Rule 4(m) provides, in part, that if service of the summons and complaint is not made upon a defendant within ninety (90) days after the filing of the complaint, the court, after notice to the plaintiff, shall dismiss the action without prejudice or direct that service be effected within a specified and appropriate time, provided the plaintiff shows good cause for the failure. An executed return of service upon any of the named defendants has not been filed in ninety (90) days. The Plaintiffs are hereby put on notice that, in the absence of satisfactory compliance with Rule 4(m) within THIRTY (30) days, the Court shall enter a dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/31/2022.(Gould, K.)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
7 7 1 pgs order Order Returning Submission Mon 09/12 3:45 PM
Order Returning Submission. Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, attached to this Order, is being returned for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11(a), which requires every pleading to be signed by at least one attorney of record or by a party personally if the party is unrepresented. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/12/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
Thursday, July 14, 2022
6 6 service Electronic Summons Issued Thu 07/14 8:59 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James W. Abrams, Robert E Artis, Debra Beard, Berrios, Denise Blanchard, William H. Bright, Jr, Brock & Scott PLLC, Joseph Cappucci, Nicholas Caprio, Christine J Ciociola, John Anthony Cirello, Dolores Colon, State of Connecticut, Benjamin Conner, Ricardo Cruz-Martinez, Murtha Cullina, Frank D'Amore, Jr, Linda Davis-Cannon, John DeStefano, Jr, James S Del Visco, Judith Rothschild Dicine, John Doe, Renee Dominguez, Justin Elicker, Ferdinand S Escoffery, A. Walter Esdaile, Dean Esserman, Farren Moishe LLC, Carl Goldfield, HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee for the Registered Note-Holders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-1, In their Official and Individual Capacities), HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee for the Benefit of People's Choice Home Loan Securities Trust Series 2005-4, Former City of New Haven Corporation, Counsel Attorney Carl M Porto II, In their Official and Individual Capacities), HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee, by and through it's Attorney In Fact Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, In their Official and Individual Capacities ), Toni Harp, Gary Hogan, Michelle L. Hummer, Karle R Jacobson, Erik Johnson, Michael Johnson, Patricia King, M. Koval, Ned Lamont, James M. Lewis, Frank Limon, Dannel Malloy, Robert Maturo, Luretha McClendon, Elizabeth McCormack, Mendez, Nicole Minervini, National Construction LLC, Serena Neal-Sanjurjo, Ouida V Nelson-Johnson, City of New Haven, Eric Herman Opin, Patrice Palumbo, Joann Peterson, Carl M. Porto, II(Attorney, Parrett Porto Parese & Colwell P.C., In his Official and Individual Capacities ), Carl M. Porto, II(Insurance Attorney, In his Official and Individual Capacities ), RBC DE LLC, RBC DE2 LLC, Rafael Ramos, Reichman Brodie Real Estate, Reichman Brodie Real Estate LLC, M. Jodi Rell, Otoniel Reyes, Richrach Properties-Hobart ST LLC, Andrew J. Rizzo, Jr, Richard A. Robinson, S. Rodriguez, Steven R. Rolnick, Regina Rush-Kittle, Arlevia Samuel, Robert Singer, Michael B Smart, Ronald Smith, Streeto, Jim Turico, Ikechukwu Umeugo, Frank B Velardi, Jr, Tyisha Walker-Myers, Robert Walsh, David Whidden, Thomas White, Mark Wilson, Terence A. Zemetis* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Kwame Nkrumah, Shannon Nkrumah, Lula Woodson,* *8 Oberlin Road* *Hamden, CT 06514*.Carolyn Woodson and Cheryl Noldon 435 Santa Monica, San Leandro, CA 94579 (Pesta, J.) (Pesta, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/14/2022) REPLACEMENT PDF
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
5 5 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 07/13 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint,,,,,,,,, filed by Kwame Nkrumah, Cheryl Noldon, Carolyn Woodson, Shannon Nkrumah,4 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,3 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 7/13/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 08, 2022
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 07/13 11:52 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/8/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Protective Order Wed 07/13 11:47 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/8/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 07/13 11:46 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/6/2022 Discovery due by 1/7/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 2/11/2023 Signed by clerk on 7/8/2022. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/13 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against James W. Abrams, Robert E Artis, Debra Beard, Berrios, Denise Blanchard, William H. Bright, Jr, Brock & Scott PLLC, Joseph Cappucci, Nicholas Caprio, Christine J Ciociola, John Anthony Cirello, Dolores Colon, State of Connecticut, Benjamin Conner, Ricardo Cruz-Martinez, Murtha Cullina, Frank D'Amore, Jr, Linda Davis-Cannon, John DeStefano, Jr, James S Del Visco, Judith Rothschild Dicine, John Doe, Renee Dominguez, Justin Elicker, Ferdinand S Escoffery, A. Walter Esdaile, Dean Esserman, Farren Moishe LLC, Carl Goldfield, HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee for the Registered Note-Holders of Renaissance Home Equity Loan Trust 2007-1, In their Official and Individual Capacities), HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee for the Benefit of People's Choice Home Loan Securities Trust Series 2005-4, Former City of New Haven Corporation, Counsel Attorney Carl M Porto II, In their Official and Individual Capacities), HSBC Bank USA, NA(As Indenture Trustee, by and through it's Attorney In Fact Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, In their Official and Individual Capacities ), Toni Harp, Gary Hogan, Michelle L. Hummer, Karle R Jacobson, Erik Johnson, Michael Johnson, Patricia King, M. Koval, Ned Lamont, James M. Lewis, Frank Limon, Dannel Malloy, Robert Maturo, Luretha McClendon, Elizabeth McCormack, Mendez, Nicole Minervini, National Construction LLC, Serena Neal-Sanjurjo, Ouida V Nelson-Johnson, City of New Haven, Eric Herman Opin, Patrice Palumbo, Joann Peterson, Carl M. Porto, II(Attorney, Parrett Porto Parese & Colwell P.C., In his Official and Individual Capacities ), Carl M. Porto, II(Insurance Attorney, In his Official and Individual Capacities ), RBC DE LLC, RBC DE2 LLC, Rafael Ramos, Reichman Brodie Real Estate, Reichman Brodie Real Estate LLC, M. Jodi Rell, Otoniel Reyes, Richrach Properties-Hobart ST LLC, Andrew J. Rizzo, Jr, Richard A. Robinson, S. Rodriguez, Steven R. Rolnick, Regina Rush-Kittle, Arlevia Samuel, Robert Singer, Michael B Smart, Ronald Smith, Streeto, Jim Turico, Ikechukwu Umeugo, Frank B Velardi, Jr, Tyisha Walker-Myers, Robert Walsh, David Whidden, Thomas White, Mark Wilson, Terence A. Zemetis, filed by Shannon Nkrumah, Kwame Nkrumah, Carolyn Woodson, Cheryl Noldon, Lula Woodson.(Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Wed 07/13 11:43 AM
Filing fee received from Kwame & Shannon Nkrumah: $ 402.00, receipt number NH-783224. (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]
service Request to Issue Summons Thu 07/14 8:55 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants (see page 33 of complaint). (Fanelle, N.)
Related: [-]