Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Julie S Sneed
Case #: 8:22-cv-01572
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 08, 2023 3:46 AM EST
Defendant
Lakeland Car Mart
Defendant
Westlake Service
Plaintiff
Carlena Tanequa Marion
18001 Sailfish Drive Apt. D
Lutz, FL 33558


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Friday, January 06, 2023
order Order Fri 01/06 3:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 1/6/2023. (APF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
5 5 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Report and Recommendations Wed 08/31 9:08 AM
ORDER ADOPTING 4 Report and Recommendation; DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiff is granted leave to file, within TWENTY (20) DAYS of the date of this Order, an amended complaint that cures, if possible, the defects noted in the Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/31/2022. (APF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
4 4 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 07/26 12:02 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Carlena Tanequa Marion, 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency filed by Carlena Tanequa Marion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on July 26, 2022. (DD)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Fri 07/15 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 12, 2022
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 07/13 11:25 AM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Carlena Tanequa Marion. (SEG)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/13 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against Lakeland Car Mart, Westlake Service filed by Carlena Tanequa Marion.(SEG)
Related: [-]