California Northern District Court
Judge:Beth Labson Freeman
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 3:22-cv-04110
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 26, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 09, 2023 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
Locket IP LLC
Plaintiff
Bungalow Living, Inc.
Represented By
Corey Ray Houmand
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 07/27 4:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/27/2022.(mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 07/27 12:57 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bungalow Living, Inc... (Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 07/27 3:16 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 07/14 10:53 AM
Summons Issued as to Locket IP LLC. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 07/14 9:58 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (slh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 07/13 6:40 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bungalow Living, Inc. (Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Wed 07/13 6:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Bungalow Living, Inc. Plaintiff's Local Rule 3-15 Disclosure of Non-Party Interested Entities or Persons and Local Rule 3-13 Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Patent/Trademark Report Wed 07/13 6:28 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent (cc: form mailed to register). (Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Wed 07/13 6:20 PM
Proposed Summons. (Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/13 5:58 PM
COMPLAINT Complaint for Declaratory Judgement of Non-Infringement and Invalidity of U.S. Patent No. 10,514,832 against Locket IP LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17348615.). Filed byBungalow Living, Inc..(Houmand, Corey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 07/13 6:12 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/27/2022. (jlg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]