Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-22848

Tennessee Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Jennie D Latta
Case #: 2:22-ap-00074
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2022
Terminated:Aug 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Credit Acceptance Corporation
25505 W. 12 Mile Road Suite 3000
Southfield, MI 48034
Represented By
Credit Acceptance Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
David Lewis Maclin, Jr.
2317 Oak Springs Drive
Cordova, TN 38016
Represented By
Brian Lynn
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Friday, August 26, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 08/26 3:54 PM
Adversary Case 2:22-ap-74 Closed (pam)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 06, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 08/06 11:38 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/06/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, August 04, 2022
7 7 court Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Thu 08/04 4:01 PM
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Related [+] (pam)
Related: [-] 6 Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint For Turnover Of 2008 Hummer H3 From Credit Acceptance Corporation (pam)
6 6 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/04 4:00 PM
Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint For Turnover Of 2008 Hummer H3 From Credit Acceptance Corporation (pam)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
5 5 court Filing Deficiency Notice (All Inclusive) Fri 07/29 8:29 AM
Notice of Deficient Filing. Issued to Brian W. Lynn, Re: Proposed Order Dismissing Plaintiff's Complaint For Turnover Of 2008 Hummer H3 From Credit Acceptance Corporation, Due to: Heading Of The Order Reflects The Defendant as "David Lewis Maclin, Jr.," Not Credit Acceptance Corporation. (djw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
court Minutes Thu 07/28 1:00 PM
Minutes; Disposition: Voluntarily Dismissed. Order to be prepared by Brian Lynn. Related [+]. Order due by 8/11/2022. (dch) Auto-docketed(CPA)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-00074 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by David Lewis Maclin Jr. against Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Lynn, Brian) Modified on 7/14/2022. EDITED TO SHOW VEHICLE RE 2008 HUMMER H3.
Saturday, July 16, 2022
4 4 court BNC Certificate Of Mailing Sat 07/16 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 07/16/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Notice Of Expedited Hearing
Thursday, July 14, 2022
3 3 notice Notice Of Expedited Hearing Thu 07/14 4:36 PM
Notice Of Expedited Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled 7/28/2022 at 10:00 AM, by telephone or videoconference, if necessary . (dch)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-00074 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by David Lewis Maclin Jr. against Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Lynn, Brian) Modified on 7/14/2022 (clm). EDITED TO SHOW VEHICLE RE 2008 HUMMER H3.
Wednesday, July 13, 2022
2 2 notice Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Wed 07/13 2:11 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Brian Lynn on behalf of Plaintiff David Lewis Maclin Jr.. (Lynn, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/13 2:06 PM
Adversary case 22-00074 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): Complaint by David Lewis Maclin Jr. against Credit Acceptance Corporation. (Lynn, Brian) Modified on 7/14/2022 (clm)
Related: [-]