New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 4:14-bk-36837
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Nov 13, 2014
Terminated:Nov 24, 2014

Debtor
WNG Properties, LLC
12 Hickory Ave
New Windsor, NY 12553-7007
Represented By
Lawrence M. Klein
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Thomas Genova, Trustee
1136 Route 9
Wappingers Falls, NY 12590
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
74 Chapel Street
Albany, NY 12207


Docket last updated: 09/09/2014 8:05 AM EDT
Monday, September 08, 2014
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 14-36837 [misc,969] ( 335.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10303722. Fee amount 335.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
1 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7). Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Lawrence M. Klein on behalf of WNG Properties, LLC. (Klein, Lawrence)
Related: [-]