Bungie Inc v. L.L.
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard A Jones |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00981 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 15, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2023 12:47 AM PST |
Defendant
L. L.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bungie Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, September 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
![]() CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. The parties'24 Stipulated MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT is granted. (VE) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Stipulated MOTION FOR ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT , filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. Noting Date 9/1/2023, (Esler, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/21 2:06 PM
Reset Deadline: Upon the joint request of the parties, and for good cause shown, the deadline for filing Joint Status Report is extended to 7/21/2023. (VE) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/7/2023, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/14/2023, Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2023, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
![]() ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's18 Motion to Dismiss. Within 14 days of the date of this order, Plaintiff may submit a first amended complaint if it so chooses. Signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (LH) |
|
Thursday, October 06, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Bungie Inc(Esler, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
![]() REPLY, filed by Defendant L. L., TO RESPONSE to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Mann, Philip) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
![]() RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Bungie Inc, to18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument Requested.(Esler, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Sunday, September 11, 2022 | ||
utility
Terminate Deadlines/Hearings
Sun 09/11 7:13 AM
***Deadlines terminated. The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to VACATE the deadlines for the FRCP 26(f) Conference, Initial Disclosures, and Joint Status Report pending the Court's ruling on Defendant's18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (VE) |
||
Thursday, September 08, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , filed by Defendant L. L.. Oral Argument Requested. Noting Date 9/30/2022, (Mann, Philip) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
17 | 17
![]() NOTICE Of Disaffirmance Of Contracts Pursuant To RCW §26.28.030 ; filed by Defendant L. L.. (Mann, Philip) |
|
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/11 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting15 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint . The deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 9/9/2022. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/22/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/29/2022, Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2022. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint , filed by Defendant L. L.. Noting Date 8/8/2022, (Mann, Philip) |
|
Thursday, July 28, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() REDACTION to13 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint by Plaintiff Bungie Inc (Esler, Brian) |
|
13 | 13
![]() SEALED AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Luca Leone on 7/20/2022, filed by Plaintiff Bungie Inc. (Esler, Brian) Modified on 7/28/2022 (SR) |
|
utility
Notice to Filer
Thu 07/28 12:46 PM
NOTICE TO FILER: re13 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint. Document(s) contain personal identifiers (name of minor child) that must be redacted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) and Local Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. You must refile a redacted version of your document by going to Other Documents and selecting Redacted Document . This event will allow you to relate back to the original filing and will not affect your original filing date. Pursuant to FRCP 5.2 and LCR 5.2, the document(s) have been administratively sealed by the Court. (SR) |
||
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE (Uncontested) Of Defendant's Status As Minor Child ; filed by Defendant L.L. (Mann, Philip) Modified on 7/25/2022 (MW) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/8/2022, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/15/2022, Joint Status Report due by 8/22/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
10 | 10
![]() STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Philip P Mann on behalf of Defendant L.L. (Mann, Philip) Modified on 7/25/2022 (MW) |
|
Thursday, July 21, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Sony Interactive Entertainment Inc. for Bungie Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bungie Inc (Esler, Brian) |
|
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 9:01 AM
ORDER re3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dylan M Schmeyer for Plaintiff Bungie Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/19 8:58 AM
ORDER re2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Akiva M Cohen for Plaintiff Bungie Inc by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (JWC) |
|
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (MJV) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Luca Leone (MJV) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 07/18 4:40 PM
Judge Richard A. Jones added. (MJV) |
||
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dylan M. Schmeyer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bungie, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7631035 (Esler, Brian) |
|
2 | 2
![]() APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Akiva M. Cohen FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Bungie, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7631023 (Esler, Brian) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT, (2) COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT, (3) FRAUD, (4) DMCA ANTI-CIRCUMVENTION, AND (5) VIOLATION OF THE WASHINGTON CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT against defendant(s) Luca Leone with JURY DEMAND Attorney Brian William Esler added to party Bungie, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Bungie, Inc..(Esler, Brian) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |