Mississippi Southern District Court
Judge:Carlton W Reeves
Referred: Andrew S Harris
Case #: 3:22-cv-00401
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2022
Terminated:May 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 11, 2023 2:29 AM CST
Defendant
Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group
Represented By
Richard Gerald Norris, II
Wells, Marble & Hurst, Pllc - Ridgeland
contact info
Plaintiff
Bridget Latrice Walker
791 W County Line Rd., Bldg 7, Apt 75
Jackson, MS 39213


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 23, 2024
30 30 order Judgment Thu 05/23 1:29 PM
AGREED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that all of Plaintiff's claims and causes of action and this matter are hereby dismissed with prejudice in their entirety, with each party to bear her and its own costs. This matter is to be closed and removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 5/23/24 (LAT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
minutes Settlement Conference Thu 05/16 4:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris: Settlement Conference held on 5/16/2024 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Bridget Walker and Richard Norris. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
29 29 24 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 05/07 5:53 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Tue 05/07 5:49 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group(Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Paula Akers,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 - W-9,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2 - 1099,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3 - Bill,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4 - Check,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-5 - Email to Juan Cook,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-6 - Order of Protection,
Att: 8 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Depo
Thursday, April 04, 2024
27 27 discov Notice to Take Deposition Thu 04/04 8:33 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff, Bridget Latrice Walker by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 03/25 7:54 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION as to #23 ,24 ,25 , and26 . Attorney should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH (CWR-ASH) on all future filings. (ND)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
26 26 discov Notice of Service of Request for Admissions Fri 03/22 5:17 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Notice of Service of Request for Admissions Fri 03/22 4:38 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Admissions by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Notice of Service of Request for Production Fri 03/22 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Service of Request for Production by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
23 23 discov Notice of Service of Interrogatories Fri 03/22 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Service of Interrogatories by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
22 22 9 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 03/01 10:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andrew S. Harris for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III on 3/1/2024 (KNS)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Fri 03/01 10:44 AM
Remark : Parties should include the newly assigned Magistrate Judge's initials ASH on future filings. (KNS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
21 21 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Tue 09/26 4:02 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by Bridget Latrice Walker.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Thursday, September 21, 2023
20 20 order Case Management Order Thu 09/21 11:03 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Disclosure due by 9/28/2023; Jury Trial set for a two-week term of court commencing 10/7/2024 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5B (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2024, time to be determined, in Chambers 5.550 (Jackson) Reeves before District Judge Carlton W. Reeves; Discovery due by 4/23/2024; Motions for Amended Pleadings due by 10/23/2023; Motions for Joinder of Parties due by 10/23/2023; Designate Experts Plaintiff Deadline due by 1/23/2024; Designate Experts for Defendant Deadline due by 2/23/2024; Motions due by 5/7/2024; Settlement Conference set for 5/16/2024 09:00 AM in Chambers 5.150 (Jackson) Ball before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. Seven (7) days before the settlement conference, the parties must submit via e-mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov an updated CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT MEMORANDUM. All parties, including a person with full settlement authority, are required to be present at the conference unless excused by the Court. If a party believes the scheduled settlement conference would not be productive and should be cancelled, the party is directed to inform the Court via e-mail of the grounds for their belief at least seven (7) days prior to the conference. ADR Report due by 8/30/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 9/21/2023. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Case Management Conference Thu 09/21 10:56 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/21/2023 in Jackson, MS. Appearing: Bridget Latrice Walker and Richard Norris. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/20 9:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 09/20 4:40 PM
Reset Hearing: Telephonic Case Management Conference reset for 9/21/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
18 18 discov Notice of Service of Disclosure Mon 09/18 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Service of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosure by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 11, 2023
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/11 3:53 PM
Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to9 Amended Complaint by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group.(Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 28, 2023
16 16 notice Rule 16(a) Initial Order Mon 08/28 4:07 PM
Rule 16(a) Initial Order Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2023 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball. No later than seven (7) days prior to the TCMC, a confidential memorandum AND a proposed Case Management Order shall be submitted via e mail to ball_chambers@mssd.uscourts.gov. Counsel for DEFENDANT shall set up the conference and, once all the parties are on the line, contact the Court at 601-608-4460. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at the address on the docket.)(JEJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 04, 2023
15 15 11 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 08/04 9:40 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part11 Motion to Dismiss; terminating13 Motion to Deny Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 08/04/2023. (DDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
14 14 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/01 10:37 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Related [+] filed by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-] ply in Support
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
13 13 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/26 8:37 AM
MOTION to Deny re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bridget Latrice Walker. (LAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
order Order Fri 04/21 10:47 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER regarding11 Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. On March 1, 2023, Defendant moved to dismiss Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's response is now overdue. On its own motion, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff an extension up to and including May 5, 2023 to file a response, if any. If Plaintiff does not file a response by this deadline, the Court may rule on the Motion without the benefit of Plaintiffs arguments. No further written order shall issue. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 04/21/2023. (DDM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
order Order Staying Discovery Thu 04/06 3:06 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group at docket11 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at the address on the docket.) Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 4/6/2023. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
12 12 20 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 03/01 11:42 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ,9 Amended Complaint filed by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 03/01 11:41 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/24 11:32 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re9 Amended Complaint . While the motion does not indicate that it is unopposed or that Plaintiff was served with a copy of the motion, the Court concludes that Plaintiff will not be prejudiced by granting Defendant an extension of one week to respond to the Amended Complaint9 . Defendant's Response to Amended Complaint is due by 3/3/2023. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 2/24/23 (YWJ)(Copy mailed to Plaintiff at address listed on docket sheet.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/23 5:43 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 Amended Complaint by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/10 2:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group, filed by Bridget Latrice Walker.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Supporting Documents
Monday, January 09, 2023
8 8 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Mon 01/09 9:46 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part4 Motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 01/09/2023. (DDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
7 7 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 12/19 1:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 Memorandum in Support of Motion,4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement Related [+] filed by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-] ply in Further Support
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 respm Response to Motion Mon 12/12 8:34 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Bridget Latrice Walker.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Supporting Documents
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
order Order Tue 12/06 4:20 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER regarding4 Defendants Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement. On November 4, 2022, Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs response is now overdue. On its own motion, the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiff an extension up to and including December 16, 2022, in which to file a response, if any. If Plaintiff does not file a response by this deadline, the Court may rule on the Motion without the benefit of Plaintiffs arguments. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by District Judge Carlton W. Reeves on 12/6/2022.(DDM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
order Order Staying Discovery Wed 11/02 4:18 PM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY pursuant to L.U.Civ.R. 16(b)(3)(B) pending a decision on the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group at docket4 . No further written order shall issue from the Court. (A copy has been mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff at 791 W County Line Rd., Bldg 7, Apt 75, Jackson, MS 39213.) Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 11/2/2022. (JEJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
5 5 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 11/01 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 11/01 11:43 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement by Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group (Norris, Richard)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 10/13 2:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bridget Latrice Walker. Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group served on 10/11/2022, answer due 11/1/2022. (LAT)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 07/15 2:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group. (LAT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/15 2:09 PM
COMPLAINT against Greater Jackson Mortuary/The Heritage Group ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 1111), filed by Bridget Latrice Walker.(LAT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - EEOC charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit - Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Notice of Assignment