Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Joseph H Mckinley, Jr
Referred: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Case #: 4:22-cv-00080
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2022
Terminated:Jan 10, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2023 4:05 AM EST
Defendant
Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC
Represented By
Anne E. Martinez
Morgan Lewis & Bockius Llp - Philadelphia
contact info
Richard A. Brown
Cosmich Simmons & Brown, PLLC
contact info
Madeline Claire Kuluz
Cosmich, Simmons & Brown, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kayla Smith
Represented By
Samuel G. Hayward, Jr.
Adams, Hayward & Welsh - Louisville
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 01/10 3:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kayla Smith. (Hayward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 09/21 5:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/21/2022. IT IS ORDERED as follows: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 9/23/2022. Plaintiff Joinder of Parties/Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2022. Defendant Joinder of Parties/Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2022. Pretrial Fact Discovery due by 5/1/2023. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 3/1/2023. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 4/3/2023. Expert Discovery depositions due by 5/15/2023. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 9:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 6/15/2023; responses due no later than 30 days, replies no later than 10 days. (Court Reporter None.) cc:counsel (EAS)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/21 2:47 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 9/20/2022 granting11 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Madeline C. Kuluz and substituting Attorney Richard A. Brown as counsel for Aramark. cc: Counsel(EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
11 11 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 09/15 1:00 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute as Counsel of Record . (Continue to receive notice:Yes) by Defendant Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC (Brown, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
10 10 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan) Tue 09/06 11:12 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kayla Smith. (Hayward, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
9 9 4 pgs order Order Tue 08/09 2:42 PM
ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. (EBOC) on 8/9/2022: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/13/2022. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2022 at 9:30 AM CDT before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl.cc:counsel; CM-HBB (EAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/05 2:07 PM
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF ANNE E. MARTINEZ Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/5/2022 granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Anne E. Martinez as counsel for Defendant Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC. cc: Counsel(EAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/04 4:13 PM
MOTION for Anne E. Martinez to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3630420. by Defendant Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC (Kuluz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, July 15, 2022
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/15 12:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc., Other Affiliate Aramark, Other Affiliate Aramark Healthcare Support Services, LLC, Other Affiliate Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corporation for Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC. by Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC. (Kuluz, Madeline)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/15 12:19 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Circuit Clerk re1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
Related: [-]
order Order - TEXT ONLY Fri 07/15 11:39 AM
TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/15/22: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (DJT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/15 11:38 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aramark Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Aramark, Corporate Parent Aramark Healthcare Support Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Aramark Intermediate Holdco Corporation for Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC.. (DJT)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Fri 07/15 11:36 AM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 07/15 11:34 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC from Grayson County Circuit Court, case number 22-CI-00133. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number AKYWDC-3617534, filed by Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC. (DJT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 List of Parties,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F
answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/15 12:21 PM
ANSWER filed in Grayson County State Court Case (See DN1 for full viewing of Answer) by Next Level Hospitality Services, LLC. (DJT)
Related: [-]