Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr
Referred: Alistair Newbern
Case #: 3:22-cv-00532
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:0101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 14, 2022
Terminated:Feb 21, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 10, 2023 2:48 AM CST
Defendant
Jay Livingston Music, Inc.
Represented By
Timothy L. Warnock
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Keane A. Barger
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Defendant
Travilyn Livingston
Represented By
Timothy L. Warnock
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Keane A. Barger
Loeb & Loeb, Llp (nashville)
contact info
Plaintiff
Tammy Livingston
Represented By
Jonathan M. Wolf
Jonathan M. Wolf, PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 16 2022
ORDER: The Magistrate Judge held an initial case management conference with counsel for the parties on November 15, 2022. After discussion regarding the anticipated scope of discovery, the Magistrate Judge directed the parties to amend the proposed initial case management order to reflect a dispositive motion deadline of no later than November 17, 2023. The parties shall file their amended joint proposed initial case management order by November 22, 2022. A telephonic case management conference is set on November 30, 2022, at 11:00 a.m. The parties shall call (888) 557-8511 and enter access code 7819165# to participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 11/16/2022. (mg)
GPO Feb 21 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 2/21/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)

Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 04, 2024
95 95 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Fri 10/04 3:05 PM
ORDER: On March 20, 2024, Tammy Livingston filed a Notice of Appeal86 . The Motion for Attorney Fees by Jay Livingston Music, Inc.,82 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/4/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]