Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00683
Case Filed:Jun 16, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 16, 2022 12:19 AM MST
Defendant
Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda (1)
Represented By
George Jacob Romero
Federal Public Defenders Office - Yuma
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
John Andrew Ballos
Us Attorneys Office - Yuma, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/16/2022 1:32 AM MST
Saturday, April 30, 2022
Arrest of Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda on 4/30/2022. (NM) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. (NM) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(NM)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda held on 5/2/2022. NO FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointing George Jacob Romero with Appointment Type: AFPD. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial as a flight risk. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. SPANISH Interpreter required. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA William Rubens (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Jon Sands on behalf of George Romero for defendant. Defendant is present via VTC and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Related [+] Hearing held 12:42 PM to 12:46 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
Tuesday, May 03, 2022
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 5/2/22.(JMA) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
6 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict by Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. (Romero, George) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 18, 2022
7 7 ORDER granting6 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf on 5/18/2022. (NM) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
8 8 MINUTE ORDER: Set/Reset Hearings as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. Change of Plea Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 11:15 AM in U.S. District Court of Arizona, 98 West 1st Street, Yuma, AZ 85364 before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NM) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 09, 2022
9 9 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT PENDING as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. Judge Diane J Humetewa drawn. Waiver number 22-360. (NM) [2:22-mj-01686-JFM]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
10 10 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda. (JMA)
Related: [-]
11 11 INFORMATION - Felony as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda (1) count(s) 1. (JMA)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT OF DEFENDANT Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda for Guilty Plea Hearing before a United States Magistrate Judge. (JMA)
Related: [-]
13 13 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Change of Plea Hearing as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda held on 6/16/2022. Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda (1) enters a plea of guilty as to Count 1 of the Information. The Court directs the US Probation Office to prepare a Presentence Report. Appearances : AUSA Marcus Shand (Duty) for the Government, AFPD George Romero for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo assists defendant. Sentencing set for 9/19/2022 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Related [+] Hearing held 11:11 AM to 11:42 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA)
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
14 14 LODGED PLEA AGREEMENT as to Rosario Guadalupe Felix-Miranda re: 13 Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only). (JMA)
Related: [-]