North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Catherine C Eagles
Referred: L Patrick Auld
Case #: 1:22-cv-00559
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2022
Terminated:Nov 21, 2023
Last checked: Friday Jan 13, 2023 4:51 AM EST
Defendant
CANDLE SCIENCE, INC.
114 W. Parrish St. FL 5
Durham, NC 27701
Represented By
GERALD LISKA
Mullen Holland & Cooper
contact info
Defendant
VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM
9201 Colony Village Ln.
Raleigh, NC 27617
Represented By
GERALD LISKA
Mullen Holland & Cooper
contact info
Defendant
LYNDSEY GIBSON
2 Spreading Oak Ct.
Durham, NC 27713
Represented By
GERALD LISKA
Mullen Holland & Cooper
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL SWIMM
41 Oakwood Dr.
Chapel Hill, NC 27517
Represented By
GERALD LISKA
Mullen Holland & Cooper
contact info
Plaintiff
ANTHONY ROGERS
3400 Croasdaile Dr. Suite 300
Durham, NC 27705
Represented By
ERIN BERRY
Forge Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
utility Motions Referred Wed 11/22 10:16 AM
Motions Referred: RE:26 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ERIN BERRY to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (rw)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/22 10:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting26 Motion to Withdraw. Attorney ERIN BERRY is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/22/2023. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
27 27 order Judgment Tue 11/21 4:34 PM
JUDGMENT signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 11/21/2023. The parties have reported that the case has settled. Therefore, it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (at)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/21 10:48 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ERIN BERRY by on behalf of ANTHONY ROGERS.(BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Case Referred to Judge Tue 11/21 9:38 AM
CASE REFERRED to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES (rw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
25 25 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 11/06 5:03 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time to File document. Stipulation of Dismissal due by 11/17/2023. Signed by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 11/06/2023. (Taylor, Abby)
Related: [-]
utility Motions Submitted Mon 11/06 9:36 AM
Motions Submitted:24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal to CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 11/03 5:30 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, THOMAS C. DUNCAN, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM.(LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
utility Case Reported Settled Wed 09/13 8:01 AM
Case Reported Settled Stipulation of Dismissal due by 10/12/2023. See Doc. 23 Notice of Settlement (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
23 23 3 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Tue 09/12 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Settlement (Joint) by ANTHONY ROGERS (GENEST, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 25, 2023
22 22 motion Compel Discovery Fri 08/25 4:25 PM
First MOTION to Compel Discovery by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM. Response to Motion due by 9/8/2023(LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 1 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 4 3 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 5 5 pgs Exhibit
Monday, May 01, 2023
order Order Mon 05/01 11:17 AM
SUPPLEMENTAL STANDARD ORDER to6 Standard Order for civil cases to include the following: The deadlines in the Local Rules provide adequate time for briefing in all but exceptional circumstances and parties should not expect motions for extensions of time to be granted. Scheduling Orders will not be modified merely because the parties so agree. The Court expects the parties to promptly move the case towards final resolution and to build in time for coping with delays and obstacles, as they are a normal part of litigation. The press of other legal work is not a valid basis for an extension of time or a continuance, as this case is just as important as other cases and clients. Issued by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 5/1/23. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
21 21 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 04/25 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 1/8/2024 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #3 before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES. A settlement conference in the above-referenced case will be set approximately 30 days before the commencement of the calendar term. Counsel are directed to bring their clients and a representative from the corporations to the settlement conference. The parties shall comply in all respects with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(3) regarding final pretrial disclosure, including the time requirements set out therein. Unless the court orders otherwise, pretrial disclosures must be made no later than December 8, 2023. Motions in limine must be filed no later than December 15, 2023. Any objections to pretrial disclosures and responses to motions in limine must be served and promptly filed no later than December 22, 2023. Each party shall file a trial brief, along with proposed instructions on the issues no later than December 18, 2023. Counsel shall consult and endeavor to file one (1) set of agreed upon jury instructions to the extent practicable and may file competing jury instructions where there is disagreement. An electronic Word version of the jury instructions shall be emailed to the assigned district judges ECF mailbox. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
20 20 1 pgs order Order Appointing Mediator Mon 02/27 8:27 PM
ORDER Appointing THOMAS C. DUNCAN, as the Mediator pursuant to LR 83.9d(a). Signed by John S. Brubaker, Clerk of Court. (Bond, Melisa)
Related: [-]
order Mediation Scheduling Order Mon 02/27 8:23 PM
MEDIATION SCHEDULING ORDER; Mediation due by 6/29/2023. (Bond, Melisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
utility Motions Referred Fri 02/24 8:45 AM
Motions Referred: RE:19 Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties, to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
order Rule 26f - Joint Fri 02/24 9:48 AM
TEXT ORDER adopting19 Certification and Report of F.R.C.P. 26(f) Conference and Discovery Plan, with the following clarification: the deadlines in Paragraph 2.f) regarding service of reports from retained experts under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(B) also apply to service of any expert disclosures required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2)(C). Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 02/24/2023. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 02/24 11:34 AM
Set Scheduling Order Deadlines: Discovery is Complex. Discovery due by 8/28/2023. The Parties agree that the mediator shall be Thomas C. Duncan. Dispositive motions due by 9/28/2023. The parties have discussed the issue of consent to the jurisdiction of a U.S. magistrate judge, and there is not unanimous consent. Trial is expected to take approximately five (5) to eight (8) days. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
notice Working Copies Notice Fri 02/24 11:35 AM
NOTICE to Counsel: Counsel shall comply with the assigned magistrate judge's working copies preference for filing non-dispositive motions and briefs including discovery matters as seen at https://www.ncmd.uscourts.gov/sites/ncmd/files/JudPref.pdf. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
19 19 motion Rule 26f Report - Joint Thu 02/23 8:18 PM
Rule 26(f) Report (Joint) filed by all parties by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM.(LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/30 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney JOHN MICHAEL GENEST on behalf of Plaintiff ANTHONY ROGERS (GENEST, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing Fri 01/20 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing: Initial Pretrial Conference Hearing set for 2/27/2023 09:30 AM in Greensboro Courtroom #1A before MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Garrett, Kim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/19 5:38 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM. (LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 05, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/05 1:42 PM
ORDER signed by JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES on 1/5/2023; that the defendants' partial motion to dismiss, Doc.9 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1. The first and second causes of action, Doc.1 at ¶¶ 64-78, are DISMISSED as to the defendants Cunningham, Gibson, and Swimm only but shall proceed against the defendant Candle Science, Inc. 2. The sixth cause of action, id. at ¶¶ 96-102, is DISMISSED as to all the defendants. 3. The third, fourth, and fifth causes of action, id. at ¶¶ 79-95, shall proceed against all the defendants. 4. To the extent the allegations at id. at ¶¶ 103-109 can be read as a separate cause of action, that cause of action is DISMISSED, but the allegations remain a part of the complaint to the extent they allege facts by which the acts of employees might be attributable to Candle Science, Inc. (Hicks, Samantha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 28, 2022
utility Motions Submitted Wed 12/28 10:38 AM
Motions Submitted:9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES- (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
14 14 6 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/27 10:36 PM
REPLY, filed by Defendants CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM, to Response to9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM. (LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
13 13 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/13 5:08 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., MICHAEL SWIMM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM,10 Brief filed by ANTHONY ROGERS. Replies due by 12/27/2022 (BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
utility Motions Referred Wed 11/30 6:57 AM
Motions Referred: RE:12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , to MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/30 9:03 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file any response to9 Partial Motion to Dismiss by 12/13/2022. Issued by MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD on 11/30/2022. (AULD, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 25, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/25 8:42 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ANTHONY ROGERS.(BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
11 11 notice Notice - Other Wed 11/16 10:34 AM
NOTICE by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM re10 Brief Certificate of Word Count (LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
10 10 respm Brief Thu 11/10 4:32 PM
BRIEF re9 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/07 5:45 PM
First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CANDLE SCIENCE, INC., VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM, LYNDSEY GIBSON, MICHAEL SWIMM. Response to Motion due by 11/28/2022(LISKA, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support of
Thursday, October 20, 2022
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/20 11:45 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY ROGERS. All Defendants. (BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice - Other Thu 10/20 11:10 AM
NOTICE to Plaintiff of Failure to Make Service within 90 Days. (Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
6 6 3 pgs order Order Wed 07/20 8:36 AM
STANDARD ORDER for civil cases proceeding before JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES.(Winchester, Robin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Right to Consent Tue 07/19 10:57 AM
Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 07/19 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Summons - VIVIAN CUNNINGHAM,
Att: 2 Summons - LYNDSEY GIBSON,
Att: 3 Summons - MICHAEL SWIMM
utility Case Assigned Tue 07/19 10:50 AM
Case ASSIGNED to JUDGE CATHERINE C. EAGLES and MAG/JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Tue 07/19 10:58 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Carter, Alexus)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 16, 2022
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Sat 07/16 7:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Anthony Rogers. (BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Sat 07/16 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ERIN BERRY on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Rogers (BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 07/16 6:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCMDC-3338864.), filed by Anthony Rogers.(BERRY, ERIN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit