California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:14-cv-04085
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2014
Terminated:Sep 18, 2015
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 8:52 PM PDT
Defendant
Bernard Schleien
Plaintiff
SA Luxury Expeditions LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Rosenfeld
Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP
contact info
Karl Stephen Kronenberger
Kronenberger Rosenfeld, LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Latin America for Less, LLC
Terminated: 01/07/2015
Represented By
Matthew Taylor Browning
Ramey And Browning PLLC
contact info
David T. Wei, Jr.
Axcel Law Partners LLP
contact info
Harry Lee Laxton, Jr.
Goldstein Lipski PLLC
contact info

GPO Nov 12 2014
ORDER ON MOTION BY LATIN AMERICA FOR LESS, LLC TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND CONTINUING HEARING re 9 Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2015. Supp. brief due by 1/8/2015 and 1/15/2015. Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2015 08:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 12, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
GPO Nov 25 2014
Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 25, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING re 39 Discovery Letter. Response due 11/28/2014 at 2:00 p.m. Two-hour meet-and-confer from 9:00 a.m. continuing until 11:00 a.m. on 12/1/2014. Discovery Hearing set for 12/1/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th
GPO Nov 25 2014
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
GPO Nov 25 2014
ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY LETTER. Response due November 28 at 2:00 p.m. re 41. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 25, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
GPO Nov 27 2014
STIPULATION AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTES, Motions terminated: 39 Discovery Letter Brief, 46 Stipulation, 41 Discovery Letter Brief.. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 27, 2014. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2014)
GPO Jan 07 2015
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Motions terminated: 9 MOTION to Dismiss. Show Cause Response due by 1/15/2015 at noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 7, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2015)
GPO Jun 02 2015
ORDER RE SPANISH TRANSLATION OF LETTER TO PERUVIAN CENTRAL AUTHORITY Translated draft due by 6/5/2015 at Noon.. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2015. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
GPO Aug 19 2015
ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANT BRENDAN SCHLEIEN BY ALTERNATIVE MEANS by Hon. William Alsup granting 68 Motion for Leave to Serve by Alternate Means.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)

Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, September 18, 2015
70 70 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 09/18 3:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by SA Luxury Expeditions LLC (Rosenfeld, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
Related: [-]