New York Southern District Court
Judge:John G Koeltl
Case #: 1:14-cv-05197
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2014
Terminated:Jan 25, 2016
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2016 8:15 AM EDT
Defendant
James Barge
Represented By
George T Conway, III
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adam Sloan Hobson
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Defendant
Michael Burns
Represented By
George T Conway, III
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adam Sloan Hobson
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Defendant
Jon Feltheimer
Represented By
George T Conway, III
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adam Sloan Hobson
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Defendant
James Keegan
Represented By
George T Conway, III
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adam Sloan Hobson
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Defendant
Lions Gate Entertainment Corp.
Represented By
George T Conway, III
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Adam Sloan Hobson
Wachtell, Lipton, Rosen & Katz
contact info
Lead Plaintiff
KBC Asset Management NV
Represented By
William Stephen Norton
Motley Rice Llc (sc)
contact info
James M. Hughes
Motley Rice Llc (sc)
contact info
Rebecca M Katz
Motley Rice Llc (ny)
contact info
William H. Narwold
Motley Rice Llc (ct)
contact info
Movant
David Moxley
Represented By
Phillip C. Kim
The Rosen Law Firm P.A.
contact info
Movant
Amado Santos
Represented By
Jason Allen Zweig
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro Llp (nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Laborers Pension Trust Fund-Detroit & Vicinity
Represented By
Samuel Howard Rudman
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp(li)
contact info
Joseph Frank Russello
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp(li)
contact info
David Avi Rosenfeld
Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd Llp(li)
contact info


1. Lions Gate wins dismissal of lawsuit over SEC probe, Icahn bid (reuters.com)
Submitted Mon 01/25/2016
Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 07, 2016
63 63 appeal USCA Mandate Tue 06/07 12:26 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to62 Notice of Appeal, filed by KBC Asset Management NV. USCA Case Number 16-536. The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to FRAP 42. The stipulation is hereby "So Ordered".. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 06/07/2016. (nd)
Related: [-]