California Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey S White
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:22-cv-04174
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2023 12:35 AM PST
Defendant
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Aaron T. Chiu
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Belinda S Lee
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Cynthia Richman
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Sarah Meyers Ray
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Affinity Credit Union
Represented By
Ben Michael Harrington
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Jeffrey Hoke Bergman
Sperling & Slater, PC
contact info
Paul Ethan Slater
Sperling Slater
contact info
Eamon Padraic Kelly
Sperling & Slater P.C.
contact info
Joseph M Vanek
Sperling & Slater, P.C.
contact info
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
William M. Strom
Sperling & Slater P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Consumers Co-Op Credit Union
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
GreenState Credit Union
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
66 66 ANSWER to Amended Complaint40 by Apple Inc.. (Lee, Belinda) Modified Text on 10/26/2023 (krp, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]