Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-40643

Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Brenda T Rhoades
Case #: 4:22-ap-04041
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jul 15, 2022
Terminated:Jul 24, 2023

Debtor
David Vu
2727 Gillespie Court
Grand Prairie, TX 75052
Last checked: never
Defendant
Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C.
8108 Boat Club Road, Suite 350
Fort Worth, TX 76179
Represented By
Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C.
contact info
Defendant
Carina Vy Oanh Tran
2207 Herrington Court
Arlington, TX 76018
Represented By
Carina Vy Oanh Tran
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark A. Weisbart
Chapter 7 Trustee 10501 N Central Expy, Suite 106
Dallas, TX 75231
Represented By
James S. Brouner
Hayward PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Monday, July 24, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Mon 07/24 9:21 AM
Adversary Case Number 22-04041 Closed. (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
17 17 court Certificate of Mailing Fri 07/07 11:32 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 07/07/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice as to Claims Asserted (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran). (lc)
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
16 16 order Dismissing Case (Adversary) Wed 07/05 2:49 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice as to Claims Asserted Related [+]. (lc)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran
Thursday, June 29, 2023
court POrder Note Thu 06/29 10:16 AM
Proposed Agreed Order or Judgment Submitted Prior to Hearing RE:1 Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
court Hearing Continued - Without Form Thu 06/01 2:18 PM
Pre Trial Conference Continued Related [+]. . Pre Trial Conference scheduled for 9/7/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart
Monday, May 22, 2023
court Hearing Set [Without Form - Adversary] Mon 05/22 10:06 AM
Pre Trial Scheduling Conference Set On Related [+]. . Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/1/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart
Thursday, April 06, 2023
court Hearing Continued (Courtroom) Thu 04/06 2:11 PM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 6/1/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ym)
Related: [-] 14 Scheduling Order Arising From Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart). Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. Discovery due by 2/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2023. (ym)
Sunday, October 09, 2022
15 15 court Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/09 11:25 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 10/09/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Scheduling Order Arising From Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart). Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. Discovery due by 2/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2023. (ym)
Friday, October 07, 2022
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/07 11:55 AM
Scheduling Order Arising From Management Conference. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 09:29 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. Discovery due by 2/10/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2023. (ym)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart
Monday, October 03, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Mon 10/03 3:58 PM
Amended Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran Related [+]. (Davis, Craig)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran filed by Defendant Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Interested Party Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Defendant Carina Vy Oanh Tran
12 12 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Mon 10/03 3:36 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran (Davis, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Initial Disclosure Fri 09/30 2:30 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosure Filed by Mark A. Weisbart (Brouner, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
10 10 court Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/19 11:27 PM
Certificate Of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. (RE: related document(s)1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart). Hearing scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 09:30 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ck)
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order and Notice of Hearing (Telephonic Management Conference) Wed 08/17 12:28 PM
Notice and Order Regarding Initial Pre-Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceeding and Scheduling of Telephonic Management Conference. Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 10/6/2022 at 09:30 AM at TELEPHONIC HEARING LOCATION. (ck)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Mark A. Weisbart
Monday, August 15, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 08/15 3:36 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran (Davis, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/26 9:49 AM
Summons Service Executed on Carina Vy Oanh Tran 7/26/2022 (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 07/26 9:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C. 7/26/2022 (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 07/19 10:29 AM
Summons Issued on Carina Vy Oanh Tran Date Issued 7/19/2022, Answer Due 8/18/2022 and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant party(s).. (pr)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 07/19 10:25 AM
Summons Issued on Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C. Date Issued 7/19/2022, Answer Due 8/18/2022 and electronically transmitted back to the filer to be served upon the relevant party(s).. (pr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
3 3 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/15 2:03 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 07/15 2:02 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons (Weisbart, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [COURT USE ONLY] Fri 07/15 1:43 PM
COMPLAINT: (91 (Declaratory judgment)),(11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)): filed by James S. Brouner on behalf of Mark A. Weisbart against Law Office of Louis B. Freeman III P.L.L.C., Carina Vy Oanh Tran. (Brouner, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet