Florida Middle District Court
Judge:William F Jung
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:22-cv-01631
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2022
Terminated:Mar 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 14, 2023 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Receivable Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Charles James McHale, Jr.
Golden Scaz Gagain, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Suzette Moore
Represented By
Suzette Marteny Moore
S. Moore Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/05 4:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Jt Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Suzette Moore. (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
order Order Wed 04/05 5:07 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the 19 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and fees. The case remains closed. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/5/2023. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Mon 03/27 12:18 PM
60-DAY ORDER dismissing case in accordance with the attached order. The Clerk is directed to terminate all pending motions/deadlines and close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/27/2023. (CCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of settlement Tue 03/21 12:19 PM
NOTICE of settlement pending by Suzette Moore (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/23 2:29 PM
NOTICE by Suzette Moore of Serving Interrogatories (1-14) (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/23 2:28 PM
NOTICE by Suzette Moore of Serving Request for Admission (1-8) (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 07, 2022
14 14 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Wed 09/07 11:29 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 8/17/2023. Pretrial statement due by 12/7/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Jury Trial set for 1/2/2024 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. Conduct mediation hearing by 7/20/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/7/2022. (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
13 13 misc Case Management Report Tue 09/06 2:01 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
12 12 answer Answer to amended complaint Thu 08/25 4:29 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to 11 Amended Complaint by Receivable Solutions, LLC.(McHale, Charles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 08/11 12:28 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Receivable Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Suzette Moore.(Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit R 15(a)(2) Written Consent
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/03 1:33 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement of Plaintiff by Suzette Moore. (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons returned executed Wed 08/03 9:39 AM
RETURN of service executed on July 21, 2022 by Suzette Moore as to Receivable Solutions, LLC.(Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service
Sunday, July 24, 2022
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 07/24 7:59 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Receivable Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Suzette Moore. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Suzette Moore.(Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 07/20 9:05 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Suzette Moore. Related case(s): No (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/20 9:04 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Suzette Moore. (Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 07/20 8:37 AM
NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge . (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 07/20 8:37 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
3 3 service Summons issued Tue 07/19 1:31 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Receivable Solutions, LLC. (SEG)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/19 8:11 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:22-cv-1631-WFJ-SPF. (SJB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/18 7:19 PM
COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunctive Relief against Receivable Solutions, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19784990) filed by Suzette Moore.(Moore, Suzette)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet