Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robert N Scola, Jr
Referred: Jonathan Goodman
Case #: 1:22-cv-22220
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2022
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
Georges Zard Abou Jaoude
Defendant
Ahmad Safa
Defendant
Mohamad Hamdoun
Plaintiff
Malka Sarid
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Natalie Menashe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Sagit Rubin
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
R.M.
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yaakov Preis
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Edna Preis
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Pizitsky
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarit Peri
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Avraham Oss
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Marina Nahshonov
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Ludmila Nahshonov
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
N.K.
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Penina Moshe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Moshe Moseri
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yael Morad
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yitzchak Menashe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yehudit Menashe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Ofit Menashe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Adi Algrasi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yitzchak Shriki
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Elin Tiran
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Shirli Timor
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Esther Tibi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yevgenya Talalaev
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Vadim Talalaev
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Niva Sigawi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Siboni
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Gad Siboni
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Roman Shuster
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Shalom Sarid
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yoram Shahar-Sabach
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Miriam Shahar-Sabach
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Matan Shahar-Sabach
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Linoy Shahar-Sabach
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Chen Shahar-Sabach
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Ziv Shahar
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Hadar Shahar
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Avi Shahar
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorit Cohen
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Yitzchak Kolangi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Maor Haroush
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Kochava Shriki
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Elior Preis
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Amir Menashe
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Semyon Eidelman
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Eidelman
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
E.T.
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Nurit Cohen
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Gal Malka
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Anat Cohen
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Zehava Binyamin
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yael Ben-Sheetrit
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Ben-Sheetrit
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Vadislav Batlin
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Tali Menashe Apter
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Stas Antonov
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yosef Algrasi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Levana Algrasi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Ron Farhan
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yael Maman
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Hana Levi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Vered Kuza
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Amit Kuza
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Yaakov Kolangi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Rina Kolangi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Gilat Kolangi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
David Kolangi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Simon Jini
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachel Jerbi
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Orit Haroush
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Dorit Haroush
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Binyamin Haroush
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Benzion Haroush
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Chen Gold
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Ruth Gamliel
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Liat Frost
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Fahima
Represented By
Asher Perlin
Law Office Of Asher Perlin
contact info

GPO Nov 28 2022
Order Granting 8 13 Plaintiffs' Motions for Alternative Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 11/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (dw00)
GPO Aug 01 2023
Order Granting Temporary Stay of Discovery: granting 53 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/1/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc)
GPO Nov 08 2023
Order Requiring Second Amended Complaint. ORDER denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Amended Complaint due by 11/22/2023. Signed by Senior District Judge Robert N Scola, Jr on 11/8/2023. See attached document for full details. (amb)

Docket last updated: 56 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
70 70 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 12/06 11:03 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) The Plaintiff has dismissed this case without prejudice consistent with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). (Not. of Dismissal, ECF No.69 ). The Court directs the Clerk to close this case. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
69 69 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Wed 12/06 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Adi Algrasi, Levana Algrasi, Yosef Algrasi, Stas Antonov, Tali Menashe Apter, Vadislav Batlin, Adam Ben-Sheetrit, Yael Ben-Sheetrit, Zehava Binyamin, Anat Cohen, Dorit Cohen, Nurit Cohen, E.T., Rachel Eidelman, Semyon Eidelman, Estate of Amir Menashe, Estate of Elior Preis, Estate of Kochava Shriki, Estate of Maor Haroush, Estate of Yitzchak Kolangi, Daniel Fahima, Ron Farhan, Liat Frost, Ruth Gamliel, Chen Gold, Benzion Haroush, Binyamin Haroush, Dorit Haroush, Orit Haroush, Rachel Jerbi, Simon Jini, David Kolangi, Gilat Kolangi, Rina Kolangi, Yaakov Kolangi, Amit Kuza, Vered Kuza, Hana Levi, Gal Malka, Yael Maman, Natalie Menashe, Ofit Menashe, Yehudit Menashe, Yitzchak Menashe, Yael Morad, Moshe Moseri, Penina Moshe, N.K., Ludmila Nahshonov, Marina Nahshonov, Avraham Oss, Sarit Peri, Michael Pizitsky, Edna Preis, Yaakov Preis, R.M., Sagit Rubin, Malka Sarid, Shalom Sarid, Avi Shahar, Hadar Shahar, Ziv Shahar, Chen Shahar-Sabach, Linoy Shahar-Sabach, Matan Shahar-Sabach, Miriam Shahar-Sabach, Yoram Shahar-Sabach, Yitzchak Shriki, Roman Shuster, Gad Siboni, Raymond Siboni, Niva Sigawi, Vadim Talalaev, Yevgenya Talalaev, Esther Tibi, Shirli Timor, Elin Tiran (Perlin, Asher)
Related: [-]