New York Southern District Court
Judge:Mary Kay Vyskocil
Case #: 1:22-cv-06130
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12132 Americans with Disabilities Act - Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2022
Terminated:Jul 19, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 3:39 AM EST
Defendant
General Store, LLC
Represented By
James Jamikorn Jantarasami
Law Office Of James Jantarasami
contact info
Plaintiff
Jasmine Toro
Represented By
Mars Khaimov
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
17 17 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 07/19 4:16 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re:16 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of General Store, LLC against Jasmine Toro. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated July 19, 2023, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 7/19/2023) (km)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appeal Package
16 16 8 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 07/19 3:06 PM
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS re:12 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by General Store, LLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED with prejudice. The Clerk of Court respectfully is requested to close this case and all pending motions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 7/19/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
15 15 24 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/21 5:57 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:12 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Jasmine Toro
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 02/14 12:55 PM
ORDER granting13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's deadline to file an opposition brief is hereby extended to February 21, 2023. Any reply shall be filed by March 7, 2023. No further extensions will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 2/14/2023) (tg)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 02/14 12:56 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/21/2023 Replies due by 3/7/2023. (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time Tue 01/17 5:23 PM
FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Mars Khaimov dated 01/17/23. Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
12 12 motion Dismiss Tue 01/03 11:43 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by General Store, LLC. Responses due by 1/17/2023.(Jantarasami, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Decl of J Jantarasami in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - "Carbon Copy Cases" - listing of substantively identical cases brought by plaintiff since July 2022,
Att: 3 Supplement Memo of Law in Support of MTD
Monday, December 19, 2022
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/19 6:33 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against General Store, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jasmine Toro. Related document:1 Complaint..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
10 10 misc Letter Mon 12/05 6:01 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Mars Khaimov dated 12/5/22 re: Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Mon 11/21 11:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER denying8 Letter Motion for Conference re:8 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 11/14/2022. LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss (12b1, 12b6) pursuant to Indiv Rule 4(A)(i) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 11/14/2022. ; granting8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The Defendant submitted a request for a pre-motion conference on its anticipated motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's complaint [ECF No. 8]. The Plaintiff has not timely filed an opposition letter. After reviewing the arguments set out in the Defendant's submission, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for a pre-motion conference is DENIED, and Defendant is GRANTED leave to file a motion to dismiss on the schedule set forth below. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before December 5, 2022, Plaintiff must inform the Court via letter whether she intends to amend her complaint. This will be Plaintiff's last opportunity to amend the complaint in response to arguments raised in Defendants letter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Plaintiff does not amend her complaint, Defendant must file its motion to dismiss on or before December 19, 2022. Further briefing shall be submitted on the schedule set forth in Local Rule 6.1(b). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the Plaintiff elects to amend her complaint, the amended complaint is due on or before December 19, 2022. Defendant must respond to any amended complaint within 14 days of its filing. In the event Defendant files a new motion to dismiss, the briefing for that motion will be on the schedule set forth in Local Rule 6.1(b). Any request for an extension or adjournment shall be made by letter filed on ECF and must be received at least 48 hours before the deadline. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate docket entry 8. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 11/21/2022) (kv)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 11/21 11:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/19/2022. Motions due by 12/19/2022. (kv)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
8 8 motion Conference Leave to File Document Mon 11/14 3:59 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 11/14/2022., LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss (12b1, 12b6) pursuant to Indiv Rule 4(A)(i) addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 11/14/2022. Document filed by General Store, LLC..(Jantarasami, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - "Carbon Copy Cases" - listing of substantively identical cases brought by plaintiff since July 2022
Monday, October 17, 2022
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/17 9:59 AM
ORDER granting6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 10/14/2022.,1 Complaint. Granted. SO ORDERED. (General Store, LLC answer due 11/14/2022.) (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/17/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 14, 2022
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/14 4:28 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from James Jantarasami dated 10/14/2022. Document filed by General Store, LLC..(Jantarasami, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation proposed to be so-ordered,
Att: 2 Supplement Notice of Appearance - General Store LLC
Monday, September 26, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/26 10:11 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Store, LLC served on 9/23/2022, answer due 10/14/2022. Service was accepted by Cashier Worker. Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 07/20 11:02 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Store, LLC. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 07/20 10:57 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 07/20 10:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 07/20 10:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 07/19 10:18 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Store, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/19 10:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/19 9:58 AM
COMPLAINT against General Store, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26432034)Document filed by Jasmine Toro..(Khaimov, Mars)
Related: [-]