Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-14539

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John K Sherwood
Case #: 2:22-ap-01233
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Thomas "Nick" Salzano, Defendant
82 Osprey Court
Secaucus, NJ 07094
Represented By
Thomas "Nick" Salzano
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Raymond Scutaro, Defendant
102 Sadler Road
Bloomfield, NJ 07003
Represented By
Arthur Raymond Scutaro
contact info
Defendant
Arthur Raymond Scutaro, Jr., Defendant
30 Blenheim Raod
Manalapan, NJ 07726
Represented By
Arthur Raymond Scutaro, Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff
National Realty Investment Advisors, LLC, Plaintiff
Riker Danzig LLP One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07960
Represented By
Joseph L. Schwartz
Riker, Danig, Scherer, Hyland, Perretti
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
80 80 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/05 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
79 79 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Wed 04/02 1:03 PM
CONSENT ORDER AND STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANTS ARTHUR SCUTTARO AND ARTHUR RAYMOND SCUTTARO . Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 4/2/2025 (zlh)
Related: [-]