Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:20-bk-50215

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 5:22-ap-05004
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2022
Terminated:Oct 07, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Centricity Credit Union, Inc.
1010 E 5th Street, Ste 2626
St. Paul, MN 55101
Plaintiff
Jennifer Irene Abdo
6277 N Tischer Rd
Duluth, MN 55804
Represented By
Jennifer Irene Abdo
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, October 07, 2022
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Fri 10/07 9:17 AM
Disposition of adversary 5:22-ap-5004. Disposition: Dismissed. (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Fri 10/07 9:18 AM
Adversary case 5:22-ap-5004 closed (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 24, 2022
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 09/24 11:22 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 09/24/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 22, 2022
5 5 order MNB Dismiss adversary proceeding - motion Thu 09/22 4:23 PM
Order Dismissing Complaint With Prejudice Related [+] (KatherineN)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 09/22 4:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [09/21/2022 10:00:00 AM]. File Size [ 2729 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:26 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 09/21 10:13 AM
Minutes re:3 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Jennifer Abdo appeared as the Plaintiff. Jared Goerlitz appeared for the Defendant. Motion granted for reasons stated on the record. (KatherineN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
3 3 motion MNB Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 08/18 4:16 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding for failure to state a claim filed by Centricity Credit Union, Inc.. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law, Proof of service, Proposed order. Hearing scheduled 9/21/2022 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 515 W First Street, Duluth, Judge William J. Fisher. (Goerlitz, Jared)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Tue 07/19 9:56 AM
Summons issued on Centricity Credit Union, Inc. Date Issued 7/19/2022, Answer Due 8/18/2022 (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Mon 07/18 4:01 PM
Adversary case 22-05004 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Jennifer Irene Abdo against Centricity Credit Union, Inc. . No Fee. (AnitaM QC MNBD)
Related: [-]