Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Marilyn J Horan
Case #: 2:22-cv-01038
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2022
Terminated:Feb 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 4:53 AM EST
Defendant
EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD
Represented By
Mark T. Caloyer
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Ashley N. Rodgers
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant
EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC
Represented By
Mark T. Caloyer
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Ashley N. Rodgers
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Mediator
GARY P. CARUSO
Represented By
Gary P. Caruso
Noblemediations
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER
Represented By
R. Sean O'Connell
Robb Leonard Mulvihill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
ROSSLYN KEMERER
Represented By
R. Sean O'Connell
Robb Leonard Mulvihill LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 74 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
48 48 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/18 1:21 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/18/2025. (bjl)
Related: [-]
47 47 misc Stipulation Tue 02/18 11:53 AM
STIPULATION for Dismissal by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER, ROSSLYN KEMERER. (O'Connell, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
46 46 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines Tue 12/17 9:28 AM
TEXT ORDER Following indications by telephone from Plaintiff's counsel that this matter has resolved, it is hereby ordered that on or before February 18, 2025, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a joint status report on the expected filing of said stipulation. It is further ordered that all attendant deadlines and conferences are cancelled. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/17/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
45 45 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/22 2:15 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs' time frame to provide expert reports is continued unitl December 23, 2024 and the Defendants' time frame to provide expert reports is continued until January 23, 2025. Video Preliminary Pretrial Conference is reset from 1/23/2025 to 3/3/2025 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/22/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
44 44 motion Amend Fri 10/18 10:13 AM
MOTION to Amend Court Order by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER. (O'Connell, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
43 43 order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines 1 - Terminate Trial Management Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Trial Management Order Deadlines Wed 10/09 3:43 PM
ORDER Motion to Compel40 granted. Defendant EvolveSkateboards and all affiliated Defendants are hereby compelled to provide full, complete and accurate answers to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories 4 thorough 14 and all supporting documentation as request by the Production of Documents in addition to all of the items addressed in Exhibit E within 45 days of this Order. Upon a failure to do so an adverse inference will attach in favor of the Plaintiffs to what is outstanding in favor of the Plaintiffs' liability claim and Plaintiffs' expert will be allowed to conclude as such in his expert report. The Expert Report Deadline is extended by 45 days. It is further ordered that the the Video Initial Pre-Trial Conference is re-set from December 2, 2024 to January 23, 2025 at 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/9/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
42 42 respm Response to Motion Mon 10/07 2:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re40 MOTION to Compel and to Extend Expert Witness Report Deadline filed by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD, EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
misc QC - No Proposed Order Attached Tue 10/01 9:32 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re40 Motion to Compel. ERROR: Proposed Order, which is required for all motions in civil cases per Local Rule LCvR7, was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that, in the future, all motions should be accompanied by an attached proposed order. (cel)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
41 41 order Order Mon 09/30 10:46 PM
TEXT ORDER Defendant shall respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel40 on or before October 7, 2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/30/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
40 40 motion Compel Mon 09/30 3:55 PM
MOTION to Compel and to Extend Expert Witness Report Deadline by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER. (O'Connell, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 09/10 3:26 PM
ORDER Upon review of the uncontested Motion to Extend Expert deadlines filed by Defendants Evolve Skateboards Pty Ltd, Evolve Sports Group, LLC f/k/a Evolve Longboards USA, LLC, said Motion is hereby GRANTED and expert deadlines are re-set as follows: Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 9/30/2024; Defendant Expert Reports due by 10/30/2024; Expert Depositions to be completed by 11/30/2024. Preliminary Pretrial Conference re-set from 11/4/2024 to 12/2/2024 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/10/2024. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
38 38 misc Proposed Order Thu 09/05 9:35 AM
Proposed Order re37 Motion to Extend Time by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD, EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
37 37 motion Extend Time Thu 08/29 1:20 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to file expert reports by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD, EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
36 36 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 06/07 4:07 PM
TEXT ORDER Following review of the parties' joint status report35 , it is hereby ordered that a. Plaintiffs expert reports are due on or before August 30, 2024; b. Defendants expert reports are due on or before September 30, 2024; and c. Expert depositions are to be completed by October 30, 2024. A Video Preliminary Pretrial Conference is set for 11/4/2024 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/7/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 06/03 9:31 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
34 34 order Order Wed 05/29 10:07 AM
TEXT ORDER By Court Order (ECF No. 33 ), the parties were to provide a joint status report by May 2, 2024. To date, no status report has been filed. Accordingly, the parties shall file a status report on or before June 3, 2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/29/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
33 33 order Order Mon 04/22 2:36 PM
TEXT ORDER Consistent with the Court's discussion with Counsel at the Post-Discovery Status Conference held on this date, Counsel shall file a joint status report on or before May 2, 2024 updating the Court on any pertinent discussions with overseas counsel and case management plan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/22/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
32 32 minutes Post-Discovery Status Conference 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 04/22 2:31 PM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Post-Discovery Status Conference held on 4/22/2024. Order on status report to follow. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobek) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
31 31 misc Status Report Tue 04/16 2:01 PM
STATUS REPORT by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
30 30 order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 02/12 12:38 PM
TEXT ORDER Video Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/22/2024 at 09:00 AM. On or before April 15, 2024, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report on the following matters:1.Resolution: a. Have the parties made any progress toward resolution? b. Will the parties be engaging in any further ADR? c. If so, when and with whom? 2. Expert Discovery: a. If expert discovery has not been completed, please provide a proposed timeline for the exchange of reports and depositions. 3. Dispositive Motions: a. Do either of the parties plan on filing any dispositive motions? b. If so, please provide a proposed timeline consistent with the Court's Standing Order regarding dispositive motions. 4. Trial: Is there anything further that needs to be done by the parties prior to scheduling for trial? Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/12/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
29 29 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 02/08 9:22 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
28 28 order Order Mon 02/05 10:24 AM
TEXT ORDER Pursuant to this Court's Text Minute Entry 27 , the parties were directed to file an Amended ADR Stipulation on or before 1/23/2024. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall file the same on or before 2/9/2024. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/5/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
27 27 minutes Post-Discovery Status Conference Tue 01/16 9:33 AM
TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Post-Discovery Status Conference held on 1/16/2024. Parties will file an Amended ADR Stipulation on or before 1/23/2024. (Court Reporter: Marsia Balobek) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
26 26 order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 09/18 11:47 AM
TEXT ORDER Defendant's Motion to Extend Discovery25 is granted. Discovery is extended to December 31, 2023 and the Post-Discovery Status Conference set for September 29, 2024 is reset for 1/16/2024 at 09:00 AM via Video Conference before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/18/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 09/14 1:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
24 24 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 07/26 12:52 PM
ORDER Upon review of the agreed Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline, said motion is granted, and the fact discovery is extended to September 21, 2023. The August 17, 2023 Post-Discovery Status Conference is reset for 9/29/2023 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/26/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2023
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 07/21 12:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 26, 2023
22 22 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 05/26 9:25 AM
ORDER Upon consideration of the Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Fact Discovery, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED, that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the discovery deadline is continued until July 27, 2023. The Post-Discovery Status Conference scheduled on June 20, 2023 is rescheduled for August 17,2023 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/26/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 05/25 3:46 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER, ROSSLYN KEMERER. (O'Connell, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, March 17, 2023
20 20 adr Report of Mediation Fri 03/17 1:43 PM
REPORT of Mediation: Case has not resolved. GARY P. CARUSO terminated. Attorney Gary P. Caruso terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed [LINK:here] or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 3/16/2023. (Noble, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Fri 01/27 2:28 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Extend Time for deadline to complete Mediation. Deadline is extended to March 16, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/27/2023. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 26, 2023
18 18 motion Extend Time Thu 01/26 2:01 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to March 16, 2023 by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Time Wed 11/16 3:48 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Extend Time for ADR. it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED, that the timeframe to complete the ADR process by way of mediation is extended until February 2, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/16/2022. (bjl)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extend Time Wed 11/16 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Complete ADR by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER. (O'Connell, R.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, October 17, 2022
15 15 order Case Management Order Mon 10/17 3:23 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 1/18/2023; Amended Pleadings due by 5/5/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 5/5/2023; Discovery due by 5/26/2023; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/20/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/17/2022. (bjl)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 10/17 12:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Gary Caruso is appointed as mediator. Party GARY P. CARUSO added. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/17/2022. (bjl)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order Implementing Fed Rule of Evidence 502(d) Mon 10/17 12:01 PM
ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/17/2022. (bjl)
Related: [-]
minutes Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference Mon 10/17 11:59 AM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/17/2022. Case Management, 502d, and ADR Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: Jane Proud) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
11 11 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 10/10 11:40 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
10 10 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Mon 10/10 11:39 AM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.1) Tue 09/27 10:06 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
8 8 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 09/20 10:37 AM
INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/10/2022; Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 10/17/2022 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/20/2022. (bjl)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Tue 09/20 8:58 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re7 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/27/2022. (av)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/19 1:30 PM
Defendants ANSWER to1 Complaint, by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/26 11:37 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 10/17/2022. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/26 11:36 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC. EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/26 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley N. Rodgers on behalf of EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Rodgers, Ashley)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/26 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Caloyer on behalf of EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD. (Caloyer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
order Order Wed 07/20 9:11 AM
STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available[LINK:Here] . Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/20/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF d ocument will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Tue 07/19 4:20 PM
COMPLAINT against EVOLVE SKATEBOARDS PTY LTD, EVOLVE SPORTS GROUP, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7203236), filed by DAVID JOSEPH KEMERER, ROSSLYN KEMERER. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet