Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Martha M Pacold
Case #: 1:22-cv-03741
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 19, 2022
Terminated:Sep 07, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 15, 2023 3:57 AM CST
Defendant
Je'Caryous Johnson Entertainment LLC
12335 Glenleigh Drive
Houston, TX 70014
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Mote
Greenberg Traurig, Llp.
contact info
Jeff C Wigginton
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Je'Caryous Johnson, TX
Represented By
Jeffrey G. Mote
Greenberg Traurig, Llp.
contact info
Jeff C Wigginton
Chamberlain, Hrdlicka, White, Williams & Aughtry, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
BMN Entertainment, LLC
4020 S Drexel Blvd
Chicago, IL 60653
Represented By
Theodore Joseph Chiacchio
contact info

GPO Sep 07 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Martha M. Pacold on 9/7/2022: Defendants' motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction 19 is granted, and the case is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss for improper venue or transfer 20 is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order 5 is denied. Enter final judgment. Civil case terminated. (rao, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.