Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Allison D Burroughs
Case #: 4:22-cv-40084
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:Dec 05, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
UKG, Inc.
Represented By
Alan Y. Wong
Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Alfred John Saikali
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L. L. P.
contact info
Elisabeth Ann Hutchinson
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Maveric Ray Searle
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
UMass Memorial Health Care, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen T. Paterniti
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
UMass Memorial Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen T. Paterniti
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Tania Ward
Represented By
Jeremiah Frei-Pearson
Finkelstein Blankinship Frei-Pearson
contact info
D. Greg Blankinship
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP
contact info
Jack J. Canzoneri
Mcdonald Lamond Canzoneri
contact info


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
51 51 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 12/05 2:19 PM
Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE. (McManus, Caetlin) (Main Document 51 replaced on 12/5/2023) (McManus, Caetlin)
Related: [-]