Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Lynn Adelman
Case #: 2:22-cv-00829
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:May 12, 2023
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 3:39 AM CST
Defendant
Guardian Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
Alan E Seneczko
Wessels Sherman Joerg Liszka Laverty Seneczko PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Pearson
Represented By
James A Walcheske
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
Paul M Secunda
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Guardian Pharmacy of Wisconsin, LLC
Terminated: 09/16/2022
Represented By
Alan E Seneczko
Wessels Sherman Joerg Liszka Laverty Seneczko PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, May 12, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/12 11:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Benjamin Pearson. (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Fri 05/12 2:32 PM
Case Terminated (bx)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
18 18 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/26 1:43 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 10/26/22. Amended Pleadings due by 11/30/2022. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 11/30/2022. Discovery due by 7/31/2023. Motions due by 9/29/2023. (cc: all counsel)(kmr)
Related: [-]
17 17 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 10/26 11:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Scheduling Conference held on 10/26/2022. Court to adopt parties proposed schedule. (kmr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Tue 10/11 1:55 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Benjamin Pearson. (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 09/22 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on October 26, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel) (kmr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 19, 2022
14 14 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/19 2:33 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Seneczko, Alan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 09/19 2:32 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC. (Seneczko, Alan)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 09/19 2:31 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Guardian Pharmacy, LLC.(Seneczko, Alan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/19 2:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E Seneczko on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Alan E. Seneczko (Seneczko, Alan)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 09/16 1:27 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 09/16/2022; GRANTING9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer and Add New Party. Answer due 9/26/2022. (cc: all counsel)(bx)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 15, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 09/15 3:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by September 26, 2022, and Add New Party by Benjamin Pearson. (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 09/15 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT (First) with Jury Demand against Guardian Pharmacy, LLC filed by Benjamin Pearson.(Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/15 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan E Seneczko on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Alan E. Seneczko (Seneczko, Alan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/21 3:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Guardian Pharmacy of Wisconsin, LLC - Waiver sent on 7/20/2022. (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 07/21 11:34 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Benjamin Pearson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 07/21 10:34 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (jcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/20 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Benjamin Pearson. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 07/20 1:36 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Benjamin Pearson. (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/20 1:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M Secunda on behalf of Benjamin Pearson. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul M Secunda (Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/20 1:21 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Guardian Pharmacy of Wisconsin, LLC by Benjamin Pearson. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4166109)(Secunda, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
service Summons Issued Wed 07/20 1:30 PM
Summons Issued as to Guardian Pharmacy of Wisconsin, LLC. (jcl)
Related: [-]