Texas Southern District Court
Judge:George C Hanks, Jr
Case #: 4:22-cv-02407
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:Oct 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 2:25 AM CST
Petitioner
Vahle, Inc.
Represented By
Dawn Shree Holiday
Jackson Walker L.L.P.
contact info
Manuel Pascal Schoenhuber
Jackson Walker, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Wanina Rae Debelo
857 North Barkley
Mesa, AR 85203


Docket last updated: 07/20/2022 2:41 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
1 1 5 pgs COMPLAINT against Vahle, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-28491621) filed by Vahle, Inc..(Holiday, Dawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Petition,
Att: 3 Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit A to Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet