Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:22-cv-01128
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:Jul 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 16, 2023 3:40 AM EST
Defendant
DAS Companies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael J. Crocenzi
Barley Snyder LLP
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Barrett
Office Of Clerk Of Court
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela L. Kern
Represented By
Sharon R. Lopez
Triquetra Law
contact info
Andrea Christine Farney
Triquetra Law
contact info

GPO Jul 12 2024
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry 61) re 35 MOTION for Summary Judgment - SEE MEMORANDUM FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/12/24. (dmn)

Docket last updated: 64 minutes ago
Thursday, August 01, 2024
66 66 misc Letter Thu 08/01 3:15 PM
Letter from Clerk of Court to parties staying any action on taxation of costs until resolution of the appeal in this matter. (hs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
64 64 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/31 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL in Non-Prisoner Case as to62 Clerk's Judgment by Pamela L. Kern. Filing Fee and Docket Fee Paid. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number APAMDC-6712919. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries.(Lopez, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, July 26, 2024
63 63 misc Bill of Costs Fri 07/26 12:48 PM
BILL OF COSTS by DAS Companies, Inc.. Taxation of Costs due by 8/9/2024. (Crocenzi, Michael)
Related: [-]