Michigan Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-20384
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Terminated:Mar 28, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Jul 21, 2022 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Patrick Nagle (1)
Represented By
Mark J. Kriger
Larene & Kriger
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Timothy P. McDonald
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/18/2024 11:36 AM EST
Wednesday, March 17, 2021
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT sworn before Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris as to Patrick McPhee Nagle (1), Ryan Gregory Paduch (2). (KBro) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 19, 2021
5 5 2 pgs ORDER WITH MOTION to Unseal1 Criminal Complaint, 3 Arrest Warrant Issued, 2 Arrest Warrant Issued as to Patrick McPhee Nagle, Ryan Gregory Paduch. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KBro) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 15, 2021
13 13 NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Timothy P. McDonald added. Attorney John N. O'Brien, II terminated. (McDonald, Timothy) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
14 14 NOTICE of Change of Assistant U.S. Attorney: Trevor M. Broad added. (Broad, Trevor) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 21, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Initial Appearance as to Patrick McPhee Nagle held on 4/21/2021. Detention Hearing set for 4/22/2021 11:00AM Disposition: Defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Kriger) (AUSA: Tim McDonald) (EBut) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
16 16 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark J. Kriger appearing for Patrick McPhee Nagle . (Kriger, Mark) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
17 17 Public Audio File of Initial Appearance on Complaint as to Patrick McPhee Nagle held on 4/21/2021 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (4.1 MB) (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER SCHEDULING A DETENTION HEARING AND FOR TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER Regarding Brady Materials as to Patrick McPhee Nagle. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 22, 2021
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand: Detention Hearing as to Patrick McPhee Nagle held on 4/22/2021, ( Preliminary Examination set for 5/5/2021 01:00 PM ) Disposition: Defendant ordered detained. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (Defendant Attorney: Mark Kriger) (AUSA: Tim McDonald) (EBut) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
20 20 RESPONSE to Motion for Pretrial Detention by Patrick McPhee Nagle (Kriger, Mark) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letters
21 21 1 pgs Public Audio File of Detention Hearing as to Patrick McPhee Nagle held on 4/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. AUDIO FILE SIZE (23.4 MB) (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 23, 2021
22 22 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 30, 2021
23 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time excluded from 5/5/21 until 6/9/21. Preliminary Examination reset for 6/9/2021 at 01:00 PM . Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MarW) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 03, 2021
24 24 TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing held on April 22, 2021 as to Patrick McPhee Nagle. (Court Transcriber: Darlene K. May) (Number of Pages: 34) The parties have 21 days to file with the court and Court Transcriber a Redaction Request of this transcript. If no request is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 days. Redaction Request due 5/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/2/2021. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, the transcript is publicly available. (May, D) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 08, 2021
26 26 STIPULATED ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle. Preliminary Examination RESET TO 7/12/2021 01:00 PM --Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 12, 2021
RESET Deadlines/Hearings as to Patrick McPhee Nagle: Preliminary Examination ADJOURNED TO 8/13/2021 01:00 PM (MWil) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
28 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time. Preliminary Examination ADJOURNED TO 8/11/2021 01:00 PM --Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (MWil) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 16, 2021
30 30 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle. Time excluded from August 13, 2021 until September 15, 2021. Preliminary Examination RESET for 9/15/2021 at 1:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr. (MacKay, K) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 15, 2021
32 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle - Time excluded from 09/15/2021 until 11/15/2021. Preliminary Examination RESET for 11/15/2021 at 1:00 PM - Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (CCie) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
34 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time excluded from 11/15/2021 until 1/18/2022. Preliminary Examination RESET for 1/18/2022 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
38 38 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time excluded from 1/18/2022 until 3/18/2022. Preliminary Examination adjourned to 3/18/2022 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 18, 2022
40 40 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time excluded from 3/18/2022 until 6/30/2022. Preliminary Examination adjourned to 6/30/2022 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
42 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Patrick McPhee Nagle Time excluded from 6/30/2022 until 7/29/2022. Preliminary Examination RESET for 7/29/2022 01:00 PM Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey. (SOso) [2:21-mj-30135-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
43 43 INFORMATION as to Patrick Nagle (1) count(s) 1, 2. (NAhm)
Related: [-]