Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Richard L Young
Referred: Tim A Baker
Case #: 1:22-cv-01455
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2022
Terminated:Nov 22, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2023 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
KIM ANDERSON
Represented By
Nicole Strickler
Messer Strickler Burnette, Ltd.
contact info
Katherine M. Saldanha Olson
Messer Strickler, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
CANE BAY PARTNERS VI, LLLP
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
KIRK MICHAEL CHEWNING
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
JAY CLARK
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
DIMENSION CREDIT (CAYMAN), L.P.
Defendant
DOES 1-20
Defendant
ESOTERIC VENTURES, LLC
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
INFOTEL INTERNATIONAL LTD.
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
DAVID JOHNSON
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
M. MARK HIGH, LTD.
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
MAKES CENTS, INC. d/b/a MAXLEND
Represented By
Leonika Rose Charging-Davison
Big Fire Law & Policy Group, LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Big Fire Law & Policy Group
contact info
Todd Allin Morman
Big Fire Law & Policy Group LLP
contact info
Defendant
STRATEGIC LINK CONSULTING, LP
Represented By
Ellen M Carey
Forde & O'Meara LLP
contact info
Brian Patrick O'Meara
Forde Law Offices LLP
contact info
Defendant
UETSA TSAKITS, INC.
Represented By
Leonika Rose Charging-Davison
Big Fire Law & Policy Group, LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Big Fire Law & Policy Group
contact info
Todd Allin Morman
Big Fire Law & Policy Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
LINDZY LEMMONS
Represented By
Daniel A. Edelman
Edelman Combs Latturner & Goodwin LLC
contact info
Heather A. Kolbus
Edelman Combs Latturner Goodwin
contact info
Matthew J. Goldstein
Edelman, Combs, Latturner & Goodwin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/11/2023 8:44 AM EST
Thursday, July 21, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT - CLASS ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Lindzy Lemmons. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7199792)(Edelman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Edelman on behalf of Plaintiff Lindzy Lemmons. (Edelman, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather A. Kolbus on behalf of Plaintiff Lindzy Lemmons. (Kolbus, Heather)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Goldstein on behalf of Plaintiff Lindzy Lemmons. (Goldstein, Matthew)
Related: [-]