New Jersey District Court
Judge:Georgette Castner
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:22-cv-04699
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2022
Terminated:Aug 14, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 18, 2023 4:01 AM EST
Defendant
ADMINISTRATIVE OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES COURTS
Plaintiff
WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.
PRINCETON, NJ 98540

GPO Aug 14 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 8/14/2023. (mg)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
12 12 appeal USCA Certified Order In Lieu of Formal Mandate (Terminates Appeal) Tue 10/22 12:49 PM
CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE as to10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR. (Finance notified) (ca3jk, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
11 11 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Mon 10/02 1:33 PM
USCA Case Number 23-2791 for10 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
10 10 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Thu 09/28 3:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to9 Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis,, Order of Dismissal, by WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (No payment or IFP application received) (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
9 9 2 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Order of Dismissal Mon 08/14 3:49 PM
ORDER that the Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Plaintiff's1 Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice, except for the claim under Title II of the ADA, which is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Plaintiff may reopen this case by filing an amended complaint in compliance with the accompanying Memorandum Opinion within 30 days of this Order's entry date. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 8/14/2023. (mg)
Related: [-]
8 8 8 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Mon 08/14 3:33 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Georgette Castner on 8/14/2023. (mg)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Thu 08/17 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT filed. Refer to docket entry1 for the complaint.(km)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
7 7 misc Letter Mon 11/21 3:53 PM
Letter requesting status update regarding case from WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Wed 08/24 11:37 AM
LETTER ORDER denying4 Motion to Appoint Pro Bono without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/24/2022. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
5 5 misc Letter Tue 08/09 2:10 PM
Letter to the Court containing his IFP Application from WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.(jal, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application IFP,
Att: 2 Envelope
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/03 3:46 PM
Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/29 2:15 PM
Reset Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Generic Message Fri 07/29 2:25 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE -2 Clerk's Letter was filed in error. (kht)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2022
4 4 motion Appoint Pro Bono Fri 07/22 3:41 PM
MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono by WILLIAM HARDY SAUNDERS, JR.. (kht)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Guidelines for Non-Prisoner Pro Se Filers Fri 07/22 3:32 PM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (kht)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Letter: Filing Fee or IFP due Fri 07/22 3:30 PM
Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 service Complaint Received Fri 07/22 3:26 PM
Complaint Received.(kht)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibits,
Att: 3 Envelope
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 07/22 3:43 PM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]