Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Timothy C Batten, Sr
Case #: 3:22-cv-00129
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2022
Terminated:Jan 31, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 17, 2023 4:20 AM EST
Defendant
Jacqulene Elaine Bridges
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
David Brooks
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Betty B. Cason
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
City of Carrollton Georgia
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Tommy Holland
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Brett Ledbetter
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Bob Uglum
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Defendant
Jim Watters
Represented By
Kirsten Searle Daughdril
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Amy Bryant Cowan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Kathryn McNamee White
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Plaintiff
Q Hayward Holdings, LLC
Represented By
James A. Balli
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Steven Lewis Jones
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info
Daniel H Weigel
Taylor English Duma LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 01/31 2:40 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
36 36 7 pgs order Order Wed 07/26 2:31 PM
CONSENT DECREE Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 7/26/2023.(dmb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment,
Att: 2 Attachment,
Att: 3 Attachment,
Att: 4 Attachment
Friday, July 21, 2023
35 35 misc Proposed Consent Order Fri 07/21 11:58 AM
PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Entry of Consent Decree.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Decree,
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
34 34 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 04/05 11:06 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion to Stay. The Stay is extended through and including 4/21/2023. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 4/4/2023. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
33 33 5 pgs motion Stay Fri 03/31 5:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay to Extend Stay of Case by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters.(Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending Stay of Case
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
32 32 misc Leave of Absence Tue 01/24 11:42 PM
Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 16-17, 2023, May 1-5, 2023, May 18-23, 2023, June 15-19, 2023, by Steven Lewis Jones. (Jones, Steven)
Related: [-]
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 01/24 2:40 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion to Stay. The case proceedings in their entirety, including the discovery period and all discovery deadlines, are hereby stayed through and including 3/31/2023. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 1/24/2023. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
30 30 motion Stay Fri 01/20 5:59 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia.(Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Staying Case
29 29 misc Stipulation Fri 01/20 5:48 PM
STIPULATION Second Amended Joint Stipulation Regarding Discovery by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia. (Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 16, 2023
28 28 misc Stipulation Mon 01/16 4:20 PM
STIPULATION re27 Stipulation, Regarding Discovery (Amended) by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters. (Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
27 27 misc Stipulation Fri 01/13 4:22 PM
STIPULATION Regarding Discovery by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters. (Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2023
26 26 discov Certificate of Service Tue 01/10 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of Carrollton Georgia.(Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
25 25 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/19 8:50 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs Notice to take the Deposition of Defendant Betty B. Cason by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
24 24 discov Certificate of Service Mon 12/19 8:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Amended Notices to take the Depositions of Defendants Tommy Holland, Jim Watters, and Jacqulene Elaine Bridges by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2022
23 23 discov Certificate of Service Sat 12/17 9:08 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiff's Notices to take the Depositions of Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Jim Watters, Bob Uglum, and Brett Ledbetter by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
22 22 discov Certificate of Service Sat 12/17 7:44 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Notices of Rule 30(b)(6) Depositions to Defendant City of Carrollton and Defendant Mayor and City Council) by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Sat 12/17 7:29 AM
NOTICE by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC of Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Discovery to Plaintiff (again, not trying to trip (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 30, 2022
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/30 3:33 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James A. Balli terminated. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 11/30/2022. (dmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2022
19 19 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 11/29 3:25 PM
MOTION to Withdraw James A. Balli as Attorneyby Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Balli, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 04, 2022
18 18 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 11/04 2:32 PM
Certification of Consent to Substitution of Counsel. Kirsten Searle Daughdril replacing attorney Kathryn McNamee White. (Daughdril, Kirsten)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
17 17 discov Certificate of Service Thu 10/20 11:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 10/20 5:40 PM
JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Initial Disclosures Thu 10/20 4:58 PM
Initial Disclosures by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters.(Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
14 14 30+ pgs order Order Mon 09/26 4:23 PM
INSTRUCTIONS To Parties and Counsel. Signed by Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. on 09/26/2022. (rsg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/20 3:23 PM
DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF by Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters. Discovery ends on 2/17/2023.(Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 09/20 3:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Bryant Cowan on behalf of Jacqulene Elaine Bridges, David Brooks, Betty B. Cason, City of Carrollton Georgia, Tommy Holland, Brett Ledbetter, Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia, Bob Uglum, Jim Watters (Cowan, Amy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Tommy Holland waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Mayor and City Council of Carrollton Georgia waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Jim Watters waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Jacqulene Elaine Bridges waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. David Brooks waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. City of Carrollton Georgia waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:09 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Brett Ledbetter waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:08 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Bob Uglum waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/28 2:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. Betty B. Cason waiver mailed on 7/22/2022, answer due 9/20/2022. (Weigel, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 07/27 4:26 PM
Clerks Notation re2 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Chief U.S. District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr. (usw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 07/22 8:40 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quintasen REIT I, Inc., Corporate Parent Q GS BI, LLC. for Q Hayward Holdings, LLC. (dmb)
Related: [-]
1 1 40 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/22 8:36 AM
COMPLAINT and Injunctive Relief with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11943389) filed by Q Hayward Holdings, LLC.(dmb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-H,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet