Minnesota District Court
Case #: 0:22-cr-00152
Case Filed:Jul 20, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 23, 2022 2:27 AM CDT
Defendant
Ramiro Granados (2)
Defendant
Sergio Granados-Reynoso (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Thomas M Hollenhorst
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/23/2022 3:10 AM CDT
Wednesday, July 20, 2022
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright by USA Thomas M Hollenhorst as to Sergio Granados-Reynoso (1) counts 1-3, Ramiro Granados (2) counts 1-2. Forfeiture allegations as to this indictment. (ABR) Modified date on 7/21/2022 (MKB).
Related: [-]
2 2 Defendant Information Sheet as to Sergio Granados-Reynoso, Ramiro Granados. (ABR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Original Signature Page