Original Case: 4:20-cv-00047

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:21-prici-11787
Typeprivate civil / diversity
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Case Filed:May 21, 2021
Terminated:Jul 22, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 25, 2022 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
PLANTATION PIPE LINE COMPANY
Represented By
Bradford A. DeVore
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
John Gregory Perry
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
Richard E. Morton
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KINDER MORGAN ENERGY PARTNERS L.P.,
Represented By
Bradford A. DeVore
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
John Gregory Perry
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
Richard E. Morton
Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
MARY JOSEPHINE OUTLAW
Represented By
James A. Satcher Jr.
James A. Satcher, Jr., PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES GREGORY OUTLAW
Represented By
James A. Satcher Jr.
James A. Satcher, Jr., PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/25/2022 4:27 AM EDT
Friday, May 21, 2021
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant James Gregory Outlaw on 05/21/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/30/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/04/2021 as to Appellant James Gregory Outlaw. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/18/2021 as to Appellee Kinder Morgan Energy Partners LP
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties
Att: 2 3 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 18 pgs DE #68 Order
Att: 4 1 pgs DE #69 Judgment