Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Matthew T Schelp
Case #: 4:22-cv-00780
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2022
Terminated:Feb 24, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 21, 2023 4:08 AM CST
Defendant
AutoAssure, LLC
Represented By
Alexander Lee Reich
Saul Ewing Llp - Chicago
contact info
Edmond Jason Tremblay
Saul Ewing Llp - Chicago
contact info
Zachary Stephen Merkle
Sandberg Phoenix Pc - St. Louis
contact info
Narcisa Przulj
Sandberg Phoenix Pc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul McGuire
Represented By
Phillip Bohrer
Bohrer Law Firm
contact info
Scott Earl Brady
Bohrer Law Firm
contact info
George A. Hanson
Stueve Siegel LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
42 42 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Wed 03/15 12:00 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 41 Consent MOTION for Continued Sealing re 39 Sealed Document, 27 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Redacted Copy due by 3/20/2023. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Continued Sealing Wed 03/15 11:57 AM
Consent MOTION for Continued Sealing re39 Sealed Document,27 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Wed 03/15 4:17 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Continued Sealing, Doc.41 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to keep the filings under seal indefinitely. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 3/15/2023. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Fri 02/24 1:35 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, Section B(2), if a party wishes for any documents previously filed under seal to remain sealed, a Motion to Continue Sealing must be filed in this case within 90 days following the final disposition of the litigation. (60-Day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 4/25/2023 90-day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 5/25/2023) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/24/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]
39 39 misc Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF) Fri 02/24 1:04 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT re 35 by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC . (TMT)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order Fri 02/24 1:01 PM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, Doc.34 , is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to keep the filing under seal indefinitely. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 2/24/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
37 37 1 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Fri 02/17 11:41 AM
ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Parties' Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement, Doc.33 , is GRANTED and the Parties' settlement is APPROVED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 02/17/2023. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
36 36 misc Redacted Document Thu 02/16 12:33 PM
REDACTION to35 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Related [+] by AutoAssure, LLC filed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-] dacted Settlement Agreement
35 35 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Thu 02/16 12:22 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 34 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Unredacted Settlement Agreement filed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Redacted Copy due by 2/21/2023. (Merkle, Zachary) (BRP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (2/16/2023) Proposed Sealed Document
34 34 motion Leave to File Under Seal Thu 02/16 12:15 PM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal the Unredacted Settlement Agreement by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Settlement Thu 02/16 11:57 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (for Approval of FLSA Settlement) by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC.(Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Redacted Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
32 32 order Case Management Order Tue 11/01 1:19 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: 3 (Complex) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (ADR Future Reference 3/30/2023.) Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 11/1/2022. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 31, 2022
minutes Rule 16 Conference Mon 10/31 10:23 AM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp:Rule 16 Conference held on 10/31/2022. Conference held by Zoom video conference. CMO to issue. (proceedings started: 10:10 AM) (proceedings ended: 10:14 AM) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Scott Brady)(Appearance for Defendant: Edmond Jason Tremblay) (BRP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
29 29 misc Redacted Document Wed 10/26 12:20 PM
REDACTION to26 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal & Combined Memorandum in Support (Amended Disclosure of Organizational Interests) ,27 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, by AutoAssure, LLC filed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Wed 10/26 12:16 PM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants AutoAssure, LLC, Endurance Vehicle Services, LLC, Paul Chernawsky, TRP (Endurance) Co-Invest Partners, LP, TRP (Endurance) GR I, LP, TRP (Endurance) TFO II, LP, Michigan Growth Capital Partners SBIC LP.. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
27 27 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Wed 10/26 12:11 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 26 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal & Combined Memorandum in Support (Amended Disclosure of Organizational Interests) filed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Redacted Copy due by 10/31/2022. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Leave to File Under Seal Wed 10/26 12:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal & Combined Memorandum in Support (Amended Disclosure of Organizational Interests) by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order Wed 10/26 4:22 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:26 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal & Combined Memorandum in Support (Amended Disclosure of Organizational Interests) by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/26/2022. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 24, 2022
25 25 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Mon 10/24 12:51 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Paul McGuire. . (Bohrer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 13, 2022
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Thu 10/13 4:09 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:23 Unopposed Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend16 Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/13/2022. (TMT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
23 23 motion Extension of Time to Amend Wed 10/05 4:46 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend16 Disclosure of OrganizationalInterests Certificate Unopposed by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Rule 16 Order Wed 10/05 12:35 PM
RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: three Joint Scheduling Plan due by 10/24/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 10/31/2022 10:00 AM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Matthew T. Schelp. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 10/05/2022. (KCD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 09/06 12:45 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate ;Proposed extension date October 5, 2022 by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order Tue 09/06 2:04 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate ;Proposed extension date October 5, 2022 by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Matthew T. Schelp on 9/6/2022. (BRP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
19 19 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 08/31 12:59 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Edmond Jason Tremblay for Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Tremblay, Edmond)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 08/31 12:49 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Alexander Lee Reich for Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Alexander
17 17 order CJRA Order Wed 08/31 9:53 AM
CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Matthew T. Schelp for all further proceedings (AFO)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Wed 08/31 9:40 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants AutoAssure, LLC, Endurance Vehicle Services, LLC.. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
order A Docket Text Order Wed 08/31 8:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:13 and14 MOTIONS for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by E. Jason Tremblay and Alexander Lee Reich on behalf of Defendant AutoAssure, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/31/2022. (ELG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
14 14 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/30 12:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Alexander Lee Reich. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9479673) by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Related [+]
Related: [-] ich, Alexander
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/30 12:14 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice E. Jason Tremblay. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9479632) by Defendant AutoAssure, LLC.(Tremblay, Edmond)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Tue 08/30 8:23 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Defendant AutoAssure, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 9/6/2022. (KJS)
Related: [-]
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Tue 08/30 8:24 AM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (KJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 22, 2022
order A Docket Text Order Mon 08/22 8:22 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Bohrer and7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Brady, both filed by plaintiff Paul McGuire; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Noce on 8/22/2022. (ELG)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/19 3:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by AutoAssure, LLC.(Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 08/19 3:05 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Zachary Stephen Merkle for Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Merkle, Zachary)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Entry of Appearance Fri 08/19 2:57 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Narcisa Przulj for Defendant AutoAssure, LLC. (Przulj, Narcisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/19 11:36 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Scott E. Brady. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9461673) by Plaintiff Paul McGuire.(Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 08/19 11:34 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Philip Bohrer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-9461665) by Plaintiff Paul McGuire.(Bohrer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, August 18, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/18 2:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Paul McGuire. AutoAssure, LLC served on 7/29/2022, answer due 8/19/2022. (Bohrer, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Tue 08/16 11:13 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Paul McGuire to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 8/26/2022.) (AFO)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
4 4 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Mon 07/25 1:43 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re1 Complaint, Original Filing Form by Plaintiff Paul McGuire. (Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Mon 07/25 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Paul McGuire Process Server: Hatfield Process Service (Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/25 9:51 AM
COMPLAINT Class and Collective Action Complaint against defendant AutoAssure, LLC with receipt number AMOEDC-9415511, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Paul McGuire.(Hanson, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons
misc Case Opening Notification Mon 07/25 3:51 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney George A. Hanson. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JDC)
Related: [-]
misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Mon 07/25 6:24 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
Related: [-]