Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:22-cv-01310
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2022
Terminated:Dec 22, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 21, 2023 5:22 AM EST
Defendant
McCleery Law Firm LLC
Represented By
Max W. Thomas
Ulmer & Berne - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Monica D DeRamus
Represented By
Billi F. Copeland
King Law
contact info
John F. Myers
Law Office Of John F. Myers
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, December 22, 2022
order Order on Motion to dismiss Thu 12/22 10:57 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's Motion to dismiss case without prejudice Related [+]. Judge Sara Lioi on 12/22/22.(P,R)
Related: [-] 11
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
11 11 motion Dismiss Wed 12/21 3:56 PM
Motion to dismiss without prejudice filed by Plaintiff Monica D DeRamus. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 18, 2022
minutes Case Management Conference Fri 11/18 6:27 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Sara Lioi. On November 18, 2022, the Court conducted a telephonic case management conference. Attorneys John Myers, Billie Copeland King, and Max Thomas participated. The Court raised the question of whether defendant qualifies as an employer for purposes of plaintiff's Title VII claims. Without conceding the question of whether independent contractors satisfy the definition of "employee" for purposes of determining whether defendant met the threshold number of employees under 42 U.S.C. § 2000e(b), counsel for defendant agreed to obtain documentation that will establish the number of employees and independent contractors that were associated with defendant during the relevant time period. Counsel for plaintiff agreed to determine whether any of plaintiff's state law claims would be barred by the relevant statute of limitations should the Title VII claims be dismissed and the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. The Court continued the case management conference until December 8, 2022 at 9:00 am. Prior to the conference, counsel shall confer and determine whether briefing is still necessary on the threshold issue under § 2000e(b). Time: 18 minutes. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
10 10 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 11/15 11:48 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Monica D DeRamus. Related document(s)9 .(Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 28, 2022
9 9 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Wed 09/28 7:42 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order : Telephone case management conference, with counsel only, to be held on 11/18/2022 at 12:30 p.m. before Judge Sara Lioi. Directions for joining the call will be emailed to counsel of record no later than the day before the CMC. The disclosures mandated by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) will all apply. Plaintiff must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 10/28/2022. All other parties must serve on opposing parties the initial disclosures by 11/4/2022. Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/28/2022. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting
Monday, September 12, 2022
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 09/12 11:21 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McCleery Law Firm LLC. (Thomas, Max)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/12 11:18 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by McCleery Law Firm LLC.(Thomas, Max)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Declaration of Gregory J. McCleery
Monday, August 08, 2022
6 6 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 08/08 2:38 PM
Original Summons issued for service upon McCleery Law Firm LLC. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 08/08 1:25 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Monica D DeRamus. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 08/08 12:00 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons (praecipe is blank - attorney to refile) filed by Monica D DeRamus.(Myers, John) Modified text on 8/8/2022 (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Original Summons
Monday, July 25, 2022
3 3 order Initial Order - Judge Lioi Mon 07/25 2:58 PM
Initial Standing Order. Judge Sara Lioi on 07/25/2022. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A - Witness List,
Att: 2 Appendix B - Exhibit List
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 07/25 2:58 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/25 1:56 PM
Complaint with jury demand against McCleery Law Firm LLC. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11535311, filed by Monica D DeRamus. (Myers, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit PXA Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit PXB Amended Charge of Discrimination
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 07/25 2:56 PM
Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 07/25 2:57 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (M,TL)
Related: [-]