Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10525
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 5:35 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
RUSSELL CUTLER
Represented By
TYLER C VAIL
Shunnarah Vail Trial Attorneys - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, February 09, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 02/09 9:58 AM
ORDER granting 5 Motion to Substitute and Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff. Added attorney DANA A LIZIK for RUSSELL CUTLER. Attorney TYLER C VAIL terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/9/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
5 5 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 02/06 3:27 PM
Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff by RUSSELL CUTLER. (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/06 3:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANA A LIZIK on behalf of RUSSELL CUTLER (LIZIK, DANA)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 02/06 4:16 PM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:5 Joint MOTION to Substitute Attorney and Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiff. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 3:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (VAIL, TYLER)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/28 8:42 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet, which can be obtained from the forms and publication at www.flnd.uscourts.gov (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17), using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/26 12:59 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7337632.), filed by RUSSELL CUTLER. (VAIL, TYLER)
Related: [-]